EP4149469 - USE OF COMPOUNDS FOR TREATING VIRAL INFECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Godavari Biorefineries Limited 45/47, Somaiya Bhavan Mahatma Gandhi Road Fort, Mumbai 400 001 MAH / IN | [2024/12] |
Former [2023/12] | For all designated states Godavari Biorefineries Ltd. Somaiya Bhavan 45/47 Mahatma Gandhi Road Fort Mumbai 400 001 Maharashtra / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ATHAVALE, Maithili Mumbai 400 001, Maharashtra / IN | 02 /
GAVADE, Sandip Mumbai 400 001, Maharashtra / IN | 03 /
KHARKAR, Prashant Mumbai-400019, Maharashtra / IN | 04 /
SRIVASTAVA, Sangeeta Mumbai 400 001, Maharashtra / IN | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Keltie LLP No. 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 21804166.3 | 10.05.2021 | [2023/12] | WO2021IN50451 | Priority number, date | IN202021019866 | 11.05.2020 Original published format: IN202021019866 | [2023/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021229602 | Date: | 18.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4149469 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4709, C07D405/12, A61P31/12, A61K31/343, A61K31/352, A61K31/5377, A61P31/14 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
A61K31/343 (EP,IL);
A61K31/7048 (US);
A61K31/352 (EP,IL);
A61K31/36 (US);
A61K31/4025 (US);
A61K31/4709 (EP,IL);
A61K31/496 (US);
A61K31/5375 (US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/12] | A61K31/4709, C07D405/12, A61P31/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON VERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON VIRUSINFEKTIONEN | [2023/12] | English: | USE OF COMPOUNDS FOR TREATING VIRAL INFECTIONS | [2023/12] | French: | UTILISATION DE COMPOSÉS POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'INFECTIONS VIRALES | [2023/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 08.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2021206309 (DONG WHA PHARM CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1,2,6-8,10-12,14,15,17 * figure 1 * * claim 1 *; | [X] - YU ZHAO ET AL, "Synthesis and Evaluation of Cleistanthin A Derivatives as Potent Vacuolar H+-ATPase Inhibitors", CHEMICAL BIOLOGY & DRUG DESIGN, BLACKWELL MUNKSGAARD, HOBOKEN, USA, (20150313), vol. 86, no. 4, doi:10.1111/CBDD.12538, ISSN 1747-0277, pages 691 - 696, XP072378814 [X] 1,2,6,10 * page 695; figure 2 * * first column; page 691 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/cbdd.12538 | [X] - AARON LINDSTROM ET AL, "Phenotypic Prioritization of Diphyllin Derivatives That Block Filoviral Cell Entry by Vacuolar (H+)-ATPase Inhibition", CHEMMEDCHEM COMMUNICATIONS, WILEY-VCH, DE, (20181128), vol. 13, no. 24, doi:10.1002/CMDC.201800587, ISSN 1860-7179, pages 2664 - 2676, XP072417229 [X] 1,2,6,10 * Scheme 1; page 2665 * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cmdc.201800587 | International search | [A]WO2008058897 (NORDIC BIOSCIENCE AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-5, 9, 10, 18 * Entire Document *; | [A]US8957230 (MULIK NILESH SHRIDHAR [IN], et al) [A] 1-5, 9, 10, 18* Entire Document *; | [A]US2017119806 (KINGHORN ALAN DOUGLAS [US], et al) [A] 1-5, 9, 10, 18 * Entire Document *; | [Y]WO2018193476 (GODAVARI BIOREFINERIES LTD [IN]) [Y] 3, 4/3, 5, 10 * pg 4, In 10-15; pg 7, In 7-10 *; | [XY]WO2019182947 (PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US]) [X] 1-2, 4/(1-2), 9, 18 * para [0005], [0014], [0017], [0093], [0097], [0100], [0108]-[0110] * [Y] 3, 4/3, 5, 10 |