EP4149649 - SPACER RING FOR CHROMATOGRAPHY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solventum Intellectual Properties Company 3M Center, 275-6E-21 2510 Conway Ave E Maplewood, MN 55144 / US | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/12] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DASHARATHI, Kannan Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
HESTER, Jonathan F. Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
JELLUM, Gregory M. Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
CASTRO FORERO, Angelines Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 21804229.9 | 27.04.2021 | [2023/12] | WO2021IB53477 | Priority number, date | US202063023510P | 12.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063023510 P | [2023/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021229341 | Date: | 18.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4149649 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SG | 18.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B01D15/22, G01N30/60 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
B01D15/22 (EP,US);
G01N30/52 (EP,US);
G01N30/60 (EP,US);
G01N2030/527 (US);
G01N2030/8831 (EP);
G01N30/96 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/12] | B01D15/22, G01N30/60, G01N30/38, B01D69/06, B01D63/08, B01J20/28, G01N30/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Title | German: | ABSTANDSRING FÜR EINE CHROMATOGRAPHIEVORRICHTUNG | [2023/12] | English: | SPACER RING FOR CHROMATOGRAPHY DEVICE | [2023/12] | French: | BAGUE D'ESPACEMENT POUR DISPOSITIF DE CHROMATOGRAPHIE | [2023/12] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4675104 (RAI VISH [US], et al); | [A]WO0050888 (PALL CORP [US], et al); | [X]WO0205934 (PALL CORP [US], et al); | [XYI]US2005205489 (SIWAK MARTIN [US]); | [A]US2017136416 (LEUTHOLD MARTIN [DE]) | International search | [X]US4895806 (LE MINH S [GB], et al); | [A]US4986909 (RAI VISH [US], et al); | [A]WO2012012172 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al); | [X]US2015060342 (DILEO ANTHONY J [US], et al) |