EP4024909 - METHOD EXECUTED BY UE AND UE, AND METHOD EXECUTED BY SMF ENTITY AND SMF ENTITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong, 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518057 / CN | ||
Former [2022/27] | For all designated states TENCENT TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) COMPANY LIMITED 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, GUANGDONG 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIONG, Chunshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 21804713.2 | 18.03.2021 | [2022/27] | WO2021CN81521 | Priority number, date | CN202010405814 | 13.05.2020 Original published format: CN202010405814 | [2022/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021227650 | Date: | 18.11.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4024909 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/18, H04W76/40 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
H04W48/18 (EP);
H04W36/0007 (CN);
H04W4/06 (US);
H04L45/16 (US);
H04L61/5007 (US);
H04W36/0011 (CN);
H04W36/0033 (CN);
H04W76/10 (US);
H04W76/40 (EP);
H04W76/11 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/27] | H04W4/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | VON EINEM BENUTZERGERÄT AUSGEFÜHRTES VERFAHREN UND BENUTZERGERÄT SOWIE VON EINER SMF-INSTANZ AUSGEFÜHRTES VERFAHREN UND SMF INSTANZ | [2022/27] | English: | METHOD EXECUTED BY UE AND UE, AND METHOD EXECUTED BY SMF ENTITY AND SMF ENTITY | [2022/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ EXÉCUTÉ PAR UN UE, ET UE CORRESPONDANT, ET PROCÉDÉ EXÉCUTÉ PAR UNE ENTITÉ SMF ET ENTITÉ SMF CORRESPONDANTE | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2022 | Translation filed | 31.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 25.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2019223250 (DAO NGOC DUNG [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0106] ** figures 5, 6A *; | [XY] - SAMSUNG, "Solution for unicast-multicast delivery mode switch", vol. SA WG2, no. Incheon, South Korea; 20200113 - 20200117, (20200107), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-2000891, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/TSGS2_136AH_Incheon/Docs/S2-2000891.zip S2-2000891_5MBS_switching_v2.doc, (20200107), XP051842945 [X] 1,6-9,14,15 * Section 6.X.2 * [Y] 2-5 | [XY] - HUAWEI ET AL, "MBS Session Management", vol. SA WG2, no. Incheon, South Korea; 20200113 - 20200117, (20200107), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-2000489, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/TSGS2_136AH_Incheon/Docs/S2-2000489.zip S2-2000489 MBS session management.doc, (20200107), XP051842554 [X] 1,6-9,14,15 * Section 6.X.2 * [Y] 2-5 | [X] - OPPO, "Solution for Broadcast Session Start", vol. SA WG2, no. Incheon, Korea; 20200113 - 20200117, (20200127), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-2001707, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/TSGS2_136AH_Incheon/Docs/S2-2001707.zip S2-2001707_e-mail_rev7_S2-2001545.doc, (20200127), XP051845605 [X] 10-13 * Section Proposal * | [Y] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; System architecture for the 5G System (5GS); Stage 2 (Release 16)", (20200327), 3GPP DRAFT; 23501-G40_CRS_IMPLEMENTED_CR2195FIX_CR2085_MOD_R4, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/Latest_SA2_Specs/DRAFT_INTERIM/Archive/23501-g40_CRs_Implemented_CR2195Fix_CR2085_mod_R4.zip 23501-g40_CRs_Implemented_CR2195Fix_CR2085_mod_R4.docx, (20200327), XP051887241 [Y] 2-5 * Section 5.15.5 * | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Procedures for the 5G System (5GS); Stage 2 (Release 16)", (20200325), 3GPP DRAFT; 23502-G40_CRS_IMPLEMENTED, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/Latest_SA2_Specs/DRAFT_INTERIM/23502-g40_CRs_Implemented.zip 23502-g40_CRs_Implemented.docx, (20200325), XP051867777 [A] 1-15 * Section 4.3.2 * | International search | [XA]US2019223250 (DAO NGOC DUNG [CA], et al) [X] 1-10, 35, 38 * description paragraphs [0073]-[0099] * [A] 11-34, 36, 37, 39; | [A]CN110169104 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-39 * entire document *; | [A]US2019349976 (RUDOLF MARIAN [CA]) [A] 1-39* entire document *; | [A]CN110972078 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-39 * entire document *; | [PX]CN111526552 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD) [PX] 1-39 * claims 1-40, description, paragraphs [0007]-[0051] *; | [A] - Nokia, "Add support for 5G Trace (triggering events in 5GC)", 3GPP Draft; S5-183336 - CR R15 to TS 32422-f00 Add support for 5G Trace (triggering events in 5GC), La Jolla, United States, (20180504), vol. SA WG5, pages 1 - 14, XP051543298 [A] 1-39 * entire document * |