EP4263981 - ACTUATING HANDLE FOR ROSE-FREE WINDOWS AND DOORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOPPE AG Industriezone 1/5 - Eurocenter 39011 Lana (BZ) / IT | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZEUS, Christian Josef Stephan 39020 Stilfs / IT | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft mbB Neue Mainzer Straße 75 60311 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/43] | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft mbB Bettinastraße 53-55 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 21807031.6 | 05.11.2021 | [2023/43] | WO2021EP80724 | Priority number, date | DE202010134060 | 17.12.2020 Original published format: DE102020134060 | [2023/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022128247 | Date: | 23.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4263981 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E05B3/08, E05B15/00 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
E05B3/08 (EP);
E05B15/0013 (EP);
E05B15/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Title | German: | BETÄTIGUNGSHANDHABE FÜR ROSETTENLOSE FENSTER UND TÜREN | [2023/43] | English: | ACTUATING HANDLE FOR ROSE-FREE WINDOWS AND DOORS | [2023/43] | French: | POIGNÉE D'ACTIONNEMENT POUR FENÊTRES ET PORTES SANS ROSETTE | [2023/43] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 19.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE202016104433U (DESCOO HARDWARE IND LTD [CN]); | [XI]EP3480394 (MASTERLAB S R L UNIPERSONALE [IT]); | [A]US2020308867 (LECLERCQ PASCAL [IT]) | by applicant | EP1683933 |