EP4225830 - YIELD-OPTIMIZED METHOD FOR PRODUCING A POLYAMIDE POWDER COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | 15.12.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKEMA FRANCE 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2023/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROGER-DALBERT, Pierrick 69492 PIERRE-BENITE CEDEX / FR | 02 /
LOZE, Jean-Yves 27470 SERQUIGNY / FR | 03 /
LABONNE, Eric 27470 SERQUIGNY / FR | [2023/33] | Representative(s) | Arkema Patent Arkema France DRD-DPI 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2023/33] | Application number, filing date | 21807167.8 | 11.10.2021 | [2023/33] | WO2021FR51761 | Priority number, date | FR20200010338 | 09.10.2020 Original published format: FR 2010338 | [2023/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022074351 | Date: | 14.04.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4225830 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08G69/06, C08G69/16, C08G69/46, C08J3/12, C09D177/02 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
C08G69/46 (EP,KR,US);
C08G69/06 (EP,KR);
C08G69/04 (US);
C08G69/08 (KR);
C08G69/16 (EP,US);
C09D177/02 (EP,KR,US);
Y02W30/62 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/33] | Title | German: | ERTRAGSOPTIMIERTES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER POLYAMIDPULVERZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2023/33] | English: | YIELD-OPTIMIZED METHOD FOR PRODUCING A POLYAMIDE POWDER COMPOSITION | [2023/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UNE COMPOSITION DE POUDRE DE POLYAMIDES AVEC RENDEMENT OPTIMISÉ | [2023/33] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/33] | 18.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]FR1495816 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG) [YD] 1,4-12 * claim - * * example - * * column 1, paragraph 4 - column 2, paragraph 1 *; | [A]US3636136 (KONOPIK ALVIN E) [A] 1-16 * claim - ** example - *; | [Y]EP0683199 (FINA RESEARCH [BE]) [Y] 1,4-12 * claim 1 * * example - *; | [Y]US2005017385 (KILNER IAN [GB]) [Y] 1,4-12 * claim 1 *; | [X]US7951416 (HEINRICH DIRK [DE], et al) [X] 13-16 * claim - * * example - * * column 6, line 8 - line 10 * | by applicant | FR1495816 | EP2247646 |