EP4153771 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR DNA CYTOSINE CARBOXYMETHYLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania 3600 Civic Center Boulevard, 9th Floor Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOHLI, Rahul Penn Valley, PA 19072 / US | 02 /
WANG, Tong Philadelphia, PA 19146 / US | 03 /
SCHUTSKY, Emily Seattle, WA 98107 / US | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/13] | Application number, filing date | 21807595.0 | 19.05.2021 | [2023/13] | WO2021US33169 | Priority number, date | US202063027254P | 19.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063027254 P | [2023/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021236778 | Date: | 25.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4153771 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/10, C12Q1/48, G16C20/50, G16C20/30 | [2024/30] | CPC: |
C12Q1/48 (EP);
C12Q1/6858 (EP,US);
C12N9/1007 (EP,US);
C12Y201/01037 (US);
C12Q1/6806 (US);
G01N2333/91011 (EP);
G01N2500/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6858, C12Q2521/125, C12Q2537/164 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/13] | C12Q1/48, G16C20/50, G16C20/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR DNA-CYTOSIN-CARBOXYMETHYLIERUNG | [2023/13] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR DNA CYTOSINE CARBOXYMETHYLATION | [2023/13] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LA CARBOXYMÉTHYLATION DE LA CYTOSINE D'ADN | [2023/13] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 11.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003100094 (HEITER DANIEL [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2019185919 (VAISVILA ROMUALDAS [US], et al); |