EP4153452 - DISPLAY SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magna Electronics Inc. 2050 Auburn Road Auburn Hills, Michigan 48326 / US | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALMEIDA, Ramiro Key Biscayne, Florida 33149 / US | 02 /
BEAUDREAU, Pierre Québec G3A2K7 / CA | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Reuter, Silke Beatrix Magna International (Germany) GmbH Kurfürst-Eppstein-Ring 11 63877 Sailauf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/13] | Völger, Silke Beatrix Magna International (Germany) GmbH Kurfürst-Eppstein-Ring 11 63877 Sailauf / DE | Application number, filing date | 21807605.7 | 24.05.2021 | [2023/13] | WO2021US33894 | Priority number, date | US202063028953P | 22.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063028953 P | [2023/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021237212 | Date: | 25.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4153452 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/26, B60Q1/28, B60Q1/50, B60Q1/54, G08B5/00, G08B5/36, G08B5/38, // B60K35/00, G06V20/58, G06V40/10, G08G1/0962, G09G3/00, G09G5/36 | [2024/05] | CPC: |
G09G3/001 (EP,US);
B60K35/00 (EP,US);
B60K35/22 (EP,US);
B60K35/28 (EP,US);
B60K35/29 (EP);
B60K35/60 (EP,US);
B60Q1/2611 (EP);
B60Q1/50 (EP);
B60Q1/5035 (EP,US);
B60Q1/5037 (EP);
B60Q1/507 (EP,US);
B60Q1/543 (EP,US);
G06V20/58 (EP,US);
G06V40/103 (EP,US);
G08G1/005 (US);
G08G1/04 (US);
G08G1/09 (US);
G08G1/0962 (EP);
G09G5/36 (EP);
B60K2360/167 (US);
B60K2360/175 (EP,US);
B60K2360/176 (EP);
B60K2360/178 (EP);
B60K2360/179 (EP);
B60K2360/1868 (EP);
B60K2360/191 (EP);
B60K2360/77 (US);
B60K2360/797 (EP);
G06V2201/08 (US);
G09G2370/20 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/13] | B60Q1/26, B60Q1/28, B60Q1/50, B60Q1/54, G08B5/00, G08B5/36, G08B5/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] | Title | German: | ANZEIGESYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2023/13] | English: | DISPLAY SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2023/13] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'AFFICHAGE | [2023/13] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 05.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004234136 (ZHU YING [US], et al) [A] 1,2,11,12,21,22* paragraphs [0044] , [0045] *; | [A]US8954217 (MONTEMERLO MICHAEL STEVEN [US], et al) [A] 1,2,11,12,21,22 * column 2, lines 52-57 * * column 13, lines 16-21 * * columns 17, 18 * * figures 9, 10 *; | [X]US9196164 (URMSON CHRISTOPHER PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10-16,20-26 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015336502 (HILLIS W DANIEL [US], et al) [A] 1-9,11-19,21-29 * the whole document *; | [YA]US2018072218 (SWEENEY MATTHEW [US], et al) [Y] 7-10,17-20,27-30 * the whole document * [A] 1,11,21; | [XY]US2018240344 (MATTHIESEN TAGGART [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10-15,20-25 * the whole document * [Y] 7-10,17-20,27-30 | International search | [Y]US2002097163 (PEDERSON JOHN C [US]) [Y] 7, 8, 17, 18, 27, 28 * entire document *; | [Y]US2004234136 (ZHU YING [US], et al) [Y] 1-30 * entire document *; | [A]US8954217 (MONTEMERLO MICHAEL STEVEN [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * entire document *; | [Y]US2018072218 (SWEENEY MATTHEW [US], et al) [Y] 1-30 * entire document *; | [A] - MINGUEZ et al., "Extending Collision Avoidance Methods to Consider the Vehicle Shape, Kinematics, and Dynamics of a Mobile Robot", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ROBOTICS, vol. 25, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TRO.2009.2011526, (20090400), URL: https://ieeexplore.ieee.org/abstract/document/4803785, (20210724), XP011332847 [A] 1-30 * > entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TRO.2009.2011526 |