EP4154143 - CYBER SECURITY FOR INSTANT MESSAGING ACROSS PLATFORMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Darktrace Holdings Limited Maurice Wilkes Building St John's Innovation Park Cambridge, CB4 0DS / GB | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOYER, John, Anthony Cambridge CB24 6ZQ / GB | 02 /
DUNN, Matthew Ely Cambridgeshire CB7 4BE / GB | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/13] | Sackin, Robert Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 21807867.3 | 18.05.2021 | [2023/13] | WO2021US32997 | Priority number, date | US202063026446P | 18.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063026446 P | US202063078092P | 14.09.2020 Original published format: US 202063078092 P | [2023/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021236663 | Date: | 25.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4154143 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/40, H04L51/046, G06N3/00, G06N20/00, H04L51/212 | [2024/29] | CPC: |
H04L51/046 (EP,US);
H04L63/1483 (US);
G06N20/00 (EP);
G06N7/01 (EP);
H04L51/212 (EP);
H04L63/1425 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2023/13] | G06F21/55, G06F21/57, G06N5/04, G06Q10/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] | Title | German: | CYBERSICHERHEIT FÜR SOFORTIGE NACHRICHTENÜBERMITTLUNG ÜBER PLATTFORMEN HINWEG | [2023/13] | English: | CYBER SECURITY FOR INSTANT MESSAGING ACROSS PLATFORMS | [2023/13] | French: | CYBERSÉCURITÉ POUR MESSAGERIE INSTANTANÉE À TRAVERS DES PLATEFORMES | [2023/13] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 30.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2017161503 (SEIGEL JAKE [CA], et al); | [A]US2018046796 (WRIGHT JORDAN [US], et al); | [X]US2020053111 (JAKOBSSON BJORN MARKUS [US]) |