EP4155832 - IMAGE FORMATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOCERA Document Solutions Inc. 1-2-28, Tamatsukuri Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka, 540-8585 / JP | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Takehiro Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-8585 / JP | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [2023/13] | Application number, filing date | 21808876.3 | 13.05.2021 | [2023/13] | WO2021JP18218 | Priority number, date | JP20200088324 | 20.05.2020 Original published format: JP 2020088324 | [2023/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021235315 | Date: | 25.11.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4155832 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G03G21/16, G03G15/20 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
G03G21/1619 (EP,US);
G03G21/1647 (EP,US);
G03G15/2017 (EP,US);
G03G15/2064 (EP,US);
G03G21/1685 (EP);
G03G21/1864 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] | Title | German: | BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/13] | English: | IMAGE FORMATION DEVICE | [2023/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FORMATION D'IMAGE | [2023/13] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2022 | Translation filed | 18.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 18.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2004340997 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [A]US2007059036 (YAMADA MASAHIKO [JP], et al) | International search | [A]JPS57142670 (MITA INDUSTRIAL CO LTD) [A] 1-7; | [A]JPH06507029 [A] 1-7; | [A]JP2000082881 (SHARP KK) [A] 1-7; | [A]US2006140675 (KIM YOUNG-MIN [KR], et al) [A] 1-7; | [A]JP2009265599 (RICOH KK) [A] 1-7; | [A]JP2015055786 (CANON KK) [A] 1-7; | [EA]JP2021086093 (KYOCERA DOCUMENT SOLUTIONS INC)[EA] 1-7 |