EP4240894 - CLOTHES DRYER HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] | 12.01.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gerhard Geiger GmbH & Co. KG Schleifmühle 6 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFFMANN, Reiner 74343 Sachsenheim / DE | 02 /
KARLE, Sören 74391 Erligheim / DE | 03 /
REICHENBACH, Robin 74391 Erligheim / DE | 04 /
MAHL, Frank 74376 Gemmrigheim / DE | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | Jeck, Jonathan JECK, FLECK & Partner mbB Klingengasse 2 P.O.Box 14 69 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [2023/37] | Application number, filing date | 21809986.9 | 08.11.2021 | [2023/37] | WO2021EP80970 | Priority number, date | DE20201006824 | 06.11.2020 Original published format: DE102020006824 | [2023/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022096722 | Date: | 12.05.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4240894 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | D06F57/12 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
D06F57/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/37] | Title | German: | WÄSCHETROCKNER EINHAUSUNG | [2023/37] | English: | CLOTHES DRYER HOUSING | [2023/37] | French: | LOGEMENT DE SÉCHOIR À LINGE | [2023/37] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/37] | 30.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR100859283B (DAEDONG GENERAL CONSTRUCTION C [KR]) [A] 1-5 * siehe die Computerübersetzung * * figures 1-6 *; | [XA]FR2969667 (JEUNEU PHILIPPE [FR]) [X] 1 * page 1, line 22 - page 2, line 24 * * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 1; figure 1 * * page 4, line 14 - line 21; figures 3-5 * [A] 2-5; | [IA]GB2534170 (PATRICK MULHOLLAND [GB]) [I] 1-3 * page 1, line 19 - line 22 * * page 7, line 16 - line 31 * * page 8, line 13 - line 19 * * page 9, line 33 - page 10, line 2 * * figures 1-9 * [A] 4,5; | [A]CN107938280 (WONLY SECURITY AND SAFETY TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * siehe die Computerübersetzung ** figures 1-5 * | by applicant | WO2006095246 | EP1856321 | DE102018104760 |