EP4236994 - POLYPEPTIDES FOR CANCER TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | 05.01.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oxford Vacmedix UK Ltd. 9400 Garsington Road Oxford Business Park Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 2HN / GB | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIANG, Shisong Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 2HN / GB | [2023/36] | Representative(s) | Impact Intellectual Property LLP 1 Sans Walk London EC1R 0LT / GB | [2023/36] | Application number, filing date | 21810080.8 | 27.10.2021 | [2023/36] | WO2021GB52794 | Priority number, date | GB20200017119 | 28.10.2020 Original published format: GB 202017119 | [2023/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022090716 | Date: | 05.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4236994 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K39/12 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
A61K39/0011 (EP,US);
A61K39/00115 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55511 (EP);
A61K2039/585 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
C12N2710/20034 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] | Title | German: | POLYPEPTIDE ZUR KREBSBEHANDLUNG | [2023/36] | English: | POLYPEPTIDES FOR CANCER TREATMENT | [2023/36] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | [2023/36] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | 25.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2017020026 (MODERNATX INC [US]); | [A]EP3235831 (OXFORD VACMEDIX UK LTD [GB], et al); | [I]WO2018081459 (MODERNATX INC [US]); | [XI]US2019365656 (GETTS DANIEL R [IL]); | by applicant | WO2007125371 | WO2016095812 |