EP4213789 - VERTICALIZING TABLE EQUIPPED WITH MEANS OF MOBILIZATION OF THE LOWER LIMBS AND LIGHT SOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pandhora S.r.l. Piazza Giacomo Matteotti 7 80133 Napoli (NA) / IT | [2024/24] |
Former [2023/30] | For all designated states Pandhora Srl Piazza Giacomo Matteotti 7 80133 Napoli / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRONCONE, Stefano 84129 Salerno (SA) / IT | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | Conversano, Gabriele Laforgia, Bruni & Partners srl Via Michele Garruba, 3 70122 Bari / IT | [2023/30] | Application number, filing date | 21810089.9 | 17.09.2021 | [2023/30] | WO2021IB58502 | Priority number, date | IT20200022195 | 21.09.2020 Original published format: IT202000022195 | [2023/30] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022058956 | Date: | 24.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4213789 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4213789 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61G13/00, A61H1/02, A61H3/00 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
A61H1/0237 (EP);
A61H1/0262 (EP,US);
A61H1/00 (EP);
A61H1/0229 (EP);
A61H3/008 (EP);
A61H7/00 (EP);
A61N5/0625 (US);
A61G13/009 (EP);
A61G2200/36 (EP);
A61G2210/90 (EP);
A61H2201/0142 (US);
A61H2201/0192 (EP);
A61H2201/10 (US);
A61H2201/123 (US);
A61H2201/1246 (US);
A61H2201/1621 (EP);
A61H2201/1626 (EP);
A61H2201/164 (EP);
A61H2201/1642 (US);
A61H2201/1645 (EP);
A61H2201/1652 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1676 (US);
A61H2201/5005 (EP);
A61H2201/5007 (US);
A61H2201/5043 (EP);
A61H2203/0406 (EP);
A61H2203/0481 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERTIKALISIERTISCH MIT MOBILISIERUNG DER UNTEREN GLIEDMASSEN UND LICHTQUELLEN | [2023/30] | English: | VERTICALIZING TABLE EQUIPPED WITH MEANS OF MOBILIZATION OF THE LOWER LIMBS AND LIGHT SOURCES | [2023/30] | French: | TABLE DE VERTICALISATION ÉQUIPÉE DE MOYENS DE MOBILISATION DES MEMBRES INFÉRIEURS ET SOURCES LUMINEUSES | [2023/30] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | 04.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6024760 (MARCHESI FABIO [IT]); | [AD]EP1169003 (BALGRIST SCHWEIZ PARAPLEGIKERZ [CH]); | [A]US2009054217 (TEETER ROGER C [US]); | [A]WO2012148064 (HONG SUK-PYO [KR]); | [XP]WO2020250092 (PANDHORA SRL [IT]) |