EP4237007 - MDMA PRODRUGS TO ASSIST PSYCHOTHERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | 19.01.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mind Medicine, Inc. One World Trade Center, Suite 8500 New York, NY 10007 / US | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUSTENBERGER, Felix 6045 Meggen / CH | 02 /
LIECHTI, Matthias Emanuel 4104 Oberwil / CH | 03 /
TRACHSEL, Daniel 3036 Detligen / CH | [2023/36] | Representative(s) | Engstle, Verena Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2023/36] | Application number, filing date | 21810123.6 | 04.11.2021 | [2023/36] | WO2021IB60227 | Priority number, date | US202063115245P | 18.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063115245 P | [2023/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022106947 | Date: | 27.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4237007 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/54, A61P25/00 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
A61K47/542 (EP);
A61K31/36 (US);
A61P25/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] | Title | German: | MDMA-PRODRUGS ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON PSYCHOTHERAPIE | [2023/36] | English: | MDMA PRODRUGS TO ASSIST PSYCHOTHERAPY | [2023/36] | French: | PROMÉDICAMENTS DE MDMA POUR AIDER À LA PSYCHOTHÉRAPIE | [2023/36] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | 31.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2009137674 (MICKLE TRAVIS [US], et al); | by applicant | WO2005032474 | WO2006121552 | US7223735 | US2009234002 | US7655630 | US2012157706 | WO2017098533 |