EP4244615 - COVER FOR A THIN-LAYER CHROMATOGRAPHY DEVELOPMENT CHAMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OBERLE, Michaela 64293 DARMSTADT / DE | 02 /
SCHUNDA, Eric 61476 KRONBERG IM TAUNUS / DE | 03 /
FISCHER, Robert 61476 KRONBERG IM TAUNUS / DE | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Merck Patent Association Merck Patent GmbH 64271 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 21810610.2 | 12.11.2021 | [2023/38] | WO2021EP81456 | Priority number, date | EP20200207937 | 16.11.2020 Original published format: EP 20207937 | [2023/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022101375 | Date: | 19.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4244615 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/94, G01N30/90 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
G01N30/94 (EP,KR,US);
G01N30/95 (US);
B01D15/1842 (US);
G01N30/90 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Title | German: | ABDECKUNG FÜR EINE DÜNNSCHICHTCHROMATOGRAPHIEENTWICKLUNGSKAMMER | [2023/38] | English: | COVER FOR A THIN-LAYER CHROMATOGRAPHY DEVELOPMENT CHAMBER | [2023/38] | French: | COUVERCLE POUR UNE CHAMBRE DE DÉVELOPPEMENT DE CHROMATOGRAPHIE À COUCHE MINCE | [2023/38] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | 15.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB1428545 (TAKESHITA Y) [Y] 5 * page 1, lines 69-78 ** page 2, lines 9-15, 36-56; figures 1-2 *; | [Y]DE3819800 (BARON LOTHAR [DE]) [Y] 5 * abstract * * column 2, line last - column 3, line 20; figures 1-2; claim 6 *; | [XYI]CN110470784 (GUANGZHOU KEMAN BIOLOGICAL TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5,8,16 * the whole document * [Y] 5,15,18 [I] 3,4,6,7,9-14,17; | [XYI] - Anonymous, "INSTRUCTION MANUAL ADC 2", (20161101), pages 1 - 40, URL: www.camag.com, (20220201), XP055886142 [X] 1,2,4,16,18 * page 2 * * pages 16-17 * * Table "Consumable parts", second row; page 32 * [Y] 15,18 [I] 3,6,7,9-15 |