EP4388608 - ELECTROCHEMICAL ASSEMBLY, CORRESPONDING ELECTROCHEMICAL CELL, BATTERY AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAFT 26 Quai Charles Pasqua 92300 Levallois-Perret / FR | [2024/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALCIDE, Kyle Saint Johns, Floride 32259 / US | 02 /
ANDERSON, Andrew Jacksonville, Floride 32207 / US | 03 /
BADET, Sébastien 33320 Le Taillan Medoc / FR | 04 /
PHILIPPE, Gilles 33450 Izon / FR | [2024/26] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2024/26] | Application number, filing date | 21811462.7 | 18.08.2021 | [2024/26] | WO2021IB00732 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023021312 | Date: | 23.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4388608 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/04, H01M10/058, H01M50/536, H01M50/538, H01M50/553 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
H01M10/049 (EP);
H01M10/0431 (EP);
H01M10/058 (EP);
H01M50/536 (EP);
H01M50/538 (EP);
H01M50/553 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHEMISCHE ANORDNUNG, ENTSPRECHENDE ELEKTROCHEMISCHE ZELLE, BATTERIE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2024/26] | English: | ELECTROCHEMICAL ASSEMBLY, CORRESPONDING ELECTROCHEMICAL CELL, BATTERY AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING | [2024/26] | French: | ENSEMBLE ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE, CELLULE ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE CORRESPONDANTE, BATTERIE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2024/26] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/26] | 07.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2012147549 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP], et al); | [Y]US2016099457 (PARK SANG-KYOON [KR], et al); | [XDYI]DE102018203052 (GS YUASA INT LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | EP1898481 | JP2014238941 | US9728787 | US10141560 | WO2019166641 |