EP4260644 - FREQUENCY RANGE 2 (FR2) NON-STANDALONE SIDELINK DISCOVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | 16.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUTTA, Sourjya San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
GULATI, Kapil San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
CHENG, Hong San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
LI, Junyi San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
SARKIS, Gabi San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 21811591.3 | 26.10.2021 | [2023/42] | WO2021US56677 | Priority number, date | US202017117772 | 10.12.2020 Original published format: US202017117772 | [2023/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022125203 | Date: | 16.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4260644 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/14, H04B7/06, H04B7/08, H04W8/00 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
H04W76/14 (EP);
H04W8/005 (EP,US);
H04B7/0617 (US);
H04B7/0695 (EP);
H04B7/088 (EP);
H04W72/0453 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] | Title | German: | NICHT EIGENSTÄNDIGE SIDELINK-ERKENNUNG IM FREQUENZBEREICH 2 (FR2) | [2023/42] | English: | FREQUENCY RANGE 2 (FR2) NON-STANDALONE SIDELINK DISCOVERY | [2023/42] | French: | DÉCOUVERTE NON AUTONOME DE LIAISON LATÉRALE DANS LA PLAGE DE FRÉQUENCES 2 (FR2) | [2023/42] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/42] | 18.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2019138283 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,6,9,10,14,19,25 * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] - [ 00112] - [00115] - [ 00119] - [00129] - [ 00137] - [00149] * * paragraphs [00160] - [00173] - [ 00179] - [00201] - [00211] - [00238] * * paragraphs [00241] - [00246] - [ 00258] - [00265] - [ 00343] , [ 00344] , [00363] - [00374] * * paragraphs [00492] - [00509] * * figures 23, 32 *[Y] 15-18,22-24; | [XAYI]US2020322774 (VARGAS JOSE EDSON [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,11,14,19,20,25 * paragraphs [0075] - [0078] - [ 0097] , [ 0098] , [ 0101] - [0140] - [ 0180] * * figures 5, 6 * [A] 6,9,10 [Y] 15-18,22-24 [I] 12,13,21 | by applicant | - 3GPP, 3rd Generation Partnership Project | - 3GPP2, 3rd Generation Partnership Project 2 |