EP4260478 - BEAM FAILURE REPORTING USING DATA FIELD IN UPLINK CONTROL CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | 16.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERLINER, Ran San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
LANDIS, Shay San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
DALLAL, Yehonatan San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
TOUBOUL, Assaf San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 21811723.2 | 28.10.2021 | [2023/42] | WO2021US72090 | Priority number, date | US202017118490 | 10.12.2020 Original published format: US202017118490 | [2023/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022126047 | Date: | 16.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4260478 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04B7/08, H04W72/04 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
H04B7/0695 (EP,US);
H04B7/06964 (KR);
H04B7/063 (EP);
H04B7/088 (EP,KR);
H04L5/001 (EP,KR);
H04W24/08 (KR);
H04W24/10 (KR);
H04W72/046 (KR,US);
H04W72/21 (KR,US);
H04W76/19 (US);
H04W80/02 (US);
H04L5/0023 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] | Title | German: | STRAHLAUSFALLMELDUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES DATENFELDES IN EINEM UPLINK-STEUERKANAL | [2023/42] | English: | BEAM FAILURE REPORTING USING DATA FIELD IN UPLINK CONTROL CHANNEL | [2023/42] | French: | SIGNALEMENT D'UNE DÉFAILLANCE DE FAISCEAU À L'AIDE D'UN CHAMP DE DONNÉES DANS UN CANAL DE CONTRÔLE DE LIAISON MONTANTE | [2023/42] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/42] | 30.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]WO2019191960 (NEC CORP [JP], et al); | [XAI]WO2020168238 (APPLE INC [US]) |