EP4155095 - TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho, 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORITA, Koki Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2023/13] | Application number, filing date | 21811783.6 | 27.01.2021 | [2023/13] | WO2021JP02854 | Priority number, date | JP20200094950 | 29.05.2020 Original published format: JP 2020094950 | [2023/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021240881 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4155095 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B60C1/00, B60C13/00, C08L21/00, C08L53/02, C08L75/04, B60C5/01 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
C08L75/04 (EP);
B60C1/0025 (EP,US);
B60C13/001 (EP,US);
B60C13/02 (EP,US);
C08K3/04 (EP);
C08K3/36 (EP);
C08L75/06 (EP);
C08L75/08 (EP);
C08G2380/00 (EP);
C08G69/40 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/04, C08L75/08 (EP);
C08K3/04, C08L77/02 (EP);
C08K3/36, C08L75/08 (EP);
C08L75/08, C08L25/08 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] | Title | German: | REIFEN | [2023/13] | English: | TIRE | [2023/13] | French: | PNEUMATIQUE | [2023/13] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2022 | Translation filed | 22.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2009298397 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND); | [A]JP2015016807 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [A]JP2016097749 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) | by applicant | JPS96207 | JPH1313522 | US4414370 | US5010166 | JPH0558005B |