EP4035751 - VIRTUAL SCENE INTERACTION METHOD AND APPARATUS, DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 06.09.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong, 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/31] | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Jue Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
GE, Chunxiao Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
ZENG, Chen Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2022/31] | Application number, filing date | 21811852.9 | 06.05.2021 | [2022/31] | WO2021CN91874 | Priority number, date | CN202010468602 | 28.05.2020 Original published format: CN202010468602 | [2022/31] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021238597 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4035751 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/35, A63F13/493, A63F13/497 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
A63F13/92 (EP);
A63F13/35 (CN,US);
A63F13/335 (CN,US);
A63F13/355 (EP);
A63F13/48 (EP);
A63F13/493 (EP);
A63F13/497 (EP);
A63F13/537 (US);
A63F13/803 (EP);
A63F13/86 (EP);
H04N21/4725 (EP);
H04N21/4781 (EP,CN);
A63F2300/407 (CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/31] | A63F13/35 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR INTERAKTION MIT VIRTUELLEN SZENEN SOWIE GERÄT, VORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/31] | English: | VIRTUAL SCENE INTERACTION METHOD AND APPARATUS, DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INTERACTION POUR SCÈNE VIRTUELLE, ET APPAREIL, DISPOSITIF ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2022/31] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2022 | Translation filed | 28.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 19.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2014055108 (GOOGLE INC [US]); | [XI]EP2745893 (SONY COMP ENTERTAINMENT US [US]); | International search | [A]US2014187315 (PERRY DAVID [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2016236084 (IKENAGA TOSHIYA [JP]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2017087464 (PERRY DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [X]CN108066986 (MIGU INTERACTIVE ENTERTAINMENT CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-20 * description paragraphs [0161]-[0251], figures 1-7 *; | [A]CN109906107 (SONY INTERACTIVE ENTERTAINMENT AMERICA LLC) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]CN110448894 (GUANGZHOU DIANYUN TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [PX]CN111603764 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD) [PX] 1-20 * description, paragraphs [0053]-[0091], and figures 1-18 * |