EP4157611 - MODULAR ARCHITECTURE FOR ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seurat Technologies, Inc. 265 Ballardvale St. Wilmington, MA 01887 / US | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAYRAMIAN, Andrew J. Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
COOKE, April L. Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 03 /
LEBLANC, Cote Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 04 /
KISSINGER, Drew W. Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 05 /
LEARD, Francis L. Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 06 /
CHITTICK, Harold W. Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 07 /
DEMUTH, James A. Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 08 /
JARBOE, Jeffrey Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 09 /
GILLESPIE, Joseph Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 10 /
KAMSHAD, Kourosh Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 11 /
FERRERI, Nicholas C. Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 12 /
DUANMU, Ning Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 13 /
KRAS, Susanne Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 14 /
MUNDON, Summer Kapuaimilia Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 15 /
SHEN, Yiyu Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 16 /
MACDONALD, J. Thare Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 21812033.5 | 26.05.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021US34273 | Priority number, date | US202063030757P | 27.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063030757 P | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021242871 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4157611 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29C64/153, B29C64/259, B29C64/268, B33Y30/00, B23K26/02, B23K26/342 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
B29C64/259 (EP,IL,KR);
B22F10/28 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B29C64/153 (EP,IL,KR);
B22F10/70 (IL);
B22F10/77 (EP,IL,KR);
B22F12/30 (IL,US);
B22F12/38 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B22F12/41 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B22F12/44 (EP,IL,KR);
B22F12/52 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B22F12/67 (IL,US);
B22F12/86 (EP,IL,KR);
B22F12/90 (EP,IL,US);
B28B1/001 (KR);
B29C64/227 (KR);
B29C64/268 (EP,IL,KR);
B29C64/329 (EP,IL,KR);
B33Y10/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B33Y40/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B33Y70/00 (KR);
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F10/70, B22F2202/11 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | MODULARE ARCHITEKTUR ZUR GENERATIVEN FERTIGUNG | [2023/14] | English: | MODULAR ARCHITECTURE FOR ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING | [2023/14] | French: | ARCHITECTURE MODULAIRE POUR FABRICATION ADDITIVE | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 06.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2017140344 (BOWERS KYLE R [US], et al) [Y] 8, 18* , abstract, para [0009], [0118] *; | [Y]US2018156296 (ALEXANDER JONATHAN H [US], et al) [Y] 4, 14 * , para [0011], [0012] *; | [Y]US2018188183 (FENG WENYI [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * , para [0003], [0004], [0028], [0036], [0046]. [0048], [0053] *; | [Y]US2020079012 (PAWLICZEK SVEN [DE], et al) [Y] 1-22 * , entire document, especially Fig. 1, para [0001], [0003], [0006], [0017], [0041]-[0048], [0063], [0067], [0081] * |