EP4157456 - ENCAPSULATED RNA REPLICONS AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ElevateBio Technologies, Inc. 200 Smith St. Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2024/31] |
Former [2023/14] | For all designated states Oncorus, Inc. 50 Hampshire Street, Suite 401 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LERNER, Lorena Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 02 /
KENNEDY, Edward M. Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 03 /
LEE, Jennifer S. Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 21812110.1 | 28.05.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021US34787 | Priority number, date | US202063032000P | 29.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063032000 P | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021243172 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4157456 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61P31/14, A61P31/12, C12N15/86 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/86 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/125 (US);
A61K48/00 (KR);
A61K9/127 (US);
A61K9/5123 (KR);
A61P31/12 (EP,KR);
A61P31/14 (EP,KR);
A61P35/00 (KR,US);
C07K14/522 (US);
C07K14/523 (US);
C07K14/54 (US);
C07K14/5434 (US);
C07K14/55 (US);
C07K16/28 (US);
C07K16/2809 (US);
C12Y304/23016 (US);
A61K2039/585 (US);
A61K2039/86 (US);
A61K2039/876 (US);
C07K2317/31 (US);
C07K2317/569 (US);
C07K2317/622 (US);
C07K2319/21 (US);
C07K2319/50 (US);
C12N2310/12 (EP);
C12N2310/121 (EP,KR);
C12N2740/16022 (EP,KR);
C12N2770/32042 (KR);
C12N2770/32043 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2770/32052 (US);
C12N2770/32071 (US);
C12N2770/32242 (KR);
C12N2770/32243 (EP,KR);
C12N2770/32343 (EP);
C12N2840/203 (EP,KR);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | VERKAPSELTE RNA-REPLIKONS UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2023/14] | English: | ENCAPSULATED RNA REPLICONS AND METHODS OF USE | [2023/14] | French: | RÉPLICONS D'ARN ENCAPSULÉS ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 11.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CA2443258 (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR]); | [XI]US2003040498 (ANSARDI DAVID CALVERT [US], et al); | [A]WO2008027560 (CERUS CORP [US], et al); | International search | [Y]US2018195048 (RAO RAMAN [SG]); | [XY]US2020140824 (FERNANDEZ SANTIDRIAN ANTONIO [US], et al) |