EP4159152 - POSITIONING DEVICE AND POSITIONING METHOD FOR MECHANICAL ARM OF SURGICAL ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suzhou Kangduo Robot Co., Ltd. Building 2 Standard Plant Industrial Village No. 300 Qingchengshan Road Suzhou New District Suzhou, Jiangsu 215153 / CN | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Jianguo Suzhou, Jiangsu 215153 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Xiaowei Suzhou, Jiangsu 215153 / CN | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/14] | Zaboliene, Reda Metida Business center Vertas Gyneju str. 16 01109 Vilnius / LT | Application number, filing date | 21812475.8 | 28.05.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021CN96983 | Priority number, date | CN202010474025 | 29.05.2020 Original published format: CN202010474025 | [2023/14] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021239139 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4159152 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/30, A61B90/00, // A61B17/34, A61B90/57, A61B17/00 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
A61B34/30 (EP,CN);
A61B34/70 (CN);
A61B90/08 (CN);
A61B90/50 (EP);
A61B90/57 (EP);
A61B17/34 (EP);
A61B17/3421 (EP);
A61B2017/00477 (EP);
A61B2034/302 (EP,CN);
A61B2090/08021 (EP,CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/14] | A61B34/30, A61B90/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | POSITIONIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND POSITIONIERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINEN MECHANISCHEN ARM EINES CHIRURGISCHEN ROBOTERS | [2023/14] | English: | POSITIONING DEVICE AND POSITIONING METHOD FOR MECHANICAL ARM OF SURGICAL ROBOT | [2023/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE POSITIONNEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE POSITIONNEMENT POUR BRAS MÉCANIQUE DE ROBOT CHIRURGICAL | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2022 | Translation filed | 24.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.06.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102013209413 (STORZ KARL GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [Y]US2015374445 (GOMBERT BERND [DE], et al); | [A]WO2019136062 (COVIDIEN LP [US]); | [XAY]CN109998682 (BEIJING TINAVI MED TECH CO LTD) | International search | [A]CN107518941 (BEIJING TIANHECHENG MEDICAL TECH CO LTD); | [A]WO2018109595 (ETHICON LLC [US]); | [A]CN110537978 (THE AFFILIATED HOSPITAL OF INNER MONGOLIA MEDICAL UNIV, et al); | [A]US2020107895 (HASHIMOTO YASUHIKO [JP], et al); | [A]WO2020092775 (INTUITIVE SURGICAL OPERATIONS [US]); | [PX]CN111529067 (HARBIN SIZHERUI INTELLIGENT MED EQUIP CO LTD) |