EP4158632 - REFRESH MANAGEMENT FOR DRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. AMD Law Department 2485 Augustine Drive Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Jing Austin, Texas 78735 / US | 02 /
MAGRO, James R. Austin, Texas 78735 / US | 03 /
BALAKRISHNAN, Kedarnath Bangalore 560066 / IN | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Hancox, Jonathan Christopher, et al Venner Shipley LLP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 21812685.2 | 25.05.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021US34068 | Priority number, date | US202016887904 | 29.05.2020 Original published format: US202016887904 | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021242766 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4158632 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/406, G11C11/4093, G06F3/06, G06F13/16, G06F11/14 | [2024/31] | CPC: |
G06F11/1443 (EP,US);
G11C11/40603 (EP,KR);
G06F13/1636 (EP);
G11C11/406 (US);
G11C11/40618 (EP,KR,US);
G11C7/1078 (KR);
G11C7/1093 (KR);
G06F2201/805 (US);
G06F2201/81 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/14] | G11C11/406, G11C11/4093, G06F3/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | AUFFRISCHUNGSVERWALTUNG FÜR DRAM | [2023/14] | English: | REFRESH MANAGEMENT FOR DRAM | [2023/14] | French: | GESTION DE RAFRAÎCHISSEMENT POUR DRAM | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2018018221 (MAGRO JAMES R [US], et al); | [Y]US2019228813 (NALE BILL [US], et al); | [Y]US2020020384 (ZHAO LIANG [CN], et al) | International search | [A]US2016224243 (SON JONG PIL [KR], et al); | [A]US2017117030 (FISCH DAVID EDWARD [US], et al); | [YA]US2018018221 (MAGRO JAMES R [US], et al); | [Y]US2019228813 (NALE BILL [US], et al); | [A]KR20200014805 (UPMEM [FR]) |