EP4160348 - TRAVELING VEHICLE SYSTEM AND CONTROL METHOD FOR TRAVELING VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murata Machinery, Ltd. 3 Minami Ochiai-cho, Kisshoin Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8326 / JP | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMOTO, Atsushi Inuyama-shi, Aichi 484-8502 / JP | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/14] | Jordan, Volker Otto Wilhelm Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21812720.7 | 20.04.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021JP15993 | Priority number, date | JP20200092386 | 27.05.2020 Original published format: JP 2020092386 | [2023/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021241079 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4160348 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B65G21/00, B61L27/00, G07C5/00, B61L19/06, H01L21/677 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
G07C5/008 (EP);
G05D1/02 (IL);
G07C9/20 (KR);
B61L27/04 (US);
H01L21/67715 (EP,US);
H01L21/67724 (US);
H01L21/67733 (EP,US);
H01L21/67736 (EP);
B61L2019/065 (EP);
G07C9/27 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/14] | G05D1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | REISEFAHRZEUGSYSTEM UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR REISEFAHRZEUG | [2023/14] | English: | TRAVELING VEHICLE SYSTEM AND CONTROL METHOD FOR TRAVELING VEHICLE | [2023/14] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR VÉHICULE EN MOUVEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE VÉHICULE EN MOUVEMENT | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2022 | Translation filed | 24.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 11.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US9758308 (NISHIKAWA TADASHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2018222686 (TAKAHARA MASAHIRO [JP], et al); | [XI]US2019066511 (YAMANE ICHIRO [JP], et al) | International search | [A]WO2015037084 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP]) [A] 1-9* claims *; | [A]JP2018128914 (DAIFUKU KK) [A] 1-9 * claims * | by applicant | JP4172466B | JP2020092386 |