EP4159669 - MICROCHANNEL CHIP AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 10.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zeon Corporation 6-2, Marunouchi, 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIOKA Hiroya Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 21813580.4 | 24.05.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021JP19664 | Priority number, date | JP20200094889 | 29.05.2020 Original published format: JP 2020094889 | [2023/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021241516 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4159669 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B81B1/00, B81C3/00, G01N37/00, G01N35/10, B01L3/00 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
G01N33/48707 (EP);
B81B1/00 (US);
B01L3/502707 (EP);
B29C65/02 (EP);
B29C65/4815 (EP);
B29C66/02241 (EP);
B29C66/026 (EP);
B29C66/1122 (EP);
B29C66/53461 (EP);
B29C66/71 (EP);
B29C66/723 (EP);
B29C66/73117 (EP);
B29C66/73118 (EP);
B29C66/7392 (EP);
B29C66/73921 (EP);
B29C66/8322 (EP);
B29C66/836 (EP);
B29C66/91943 (EP);
B29C66/91945 (EP);
B81C3/001 (US);
B01L2200/0689 (EP);
B01L2300/0816 (EP);
B01L2300/0887 (EP);
B01L2300/12 (EP);
B29C65/18 (EP);
B29L2031/753 (EP);
B29L2031/756 (EP);
B81C2203/036 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/38 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/14] | B81B1/00, B81C3/00, G01N37/00, G01N35/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | MIKROKANALCHIP UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2023/14] | English: | MICROCHANNEL CHIP AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2023/14] | French: | PUCE À MICROCANAL ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2022 | Translation filed | 17.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 17.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 09.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3231507 (ENPLAS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [XI]CA3153549 (SPINDIAG GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-5 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0051] * * figures 1, 2, 3 * [I] 2 | International search | [A]JP2012066518 (NIPPON ZEON CO) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0006]-[0065] *; | [A]WO2018180508 (ZEON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * claims 1-6, paragraphs [0016]-[0054], fig. 1 *; | [A]JP2018161687 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0011]-[0099], fig. 1-2 *; | [A]JP2019129748 (NIPPON ZEON CO) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0021]-[0066] *; | [A]JP2020011403 (SAMCO INC) [A] 1-5* paragraphs [0008]-[0048] * | by applicant | WO2010110323 | JP2015054885 | WO2017199980 |