EP4148004 - SORTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Jingdong Qianshi Technology Co., Ltd. Room A1905, 19th Floor, No. 2 Building No. 18 Kechuang 11 Street Beijing Economic and Technological Development Zone Beijing 100176 / CN | [2023/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Jia Beijing 100176 / CN | [2023/11] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2023/11] | Application number, filing date | 21814589.4 | 08.05.2021 | [2023/11] | WO2021CN92253 | Priority number, date | CN202010462376 | 27.05.2020 Original published format: CN202010462376 | [2023/11] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021238613 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4148004 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/137, B65G1/04, B07C3/08, B07C5/36, B65G1/02, B65G1/06, B65G1/10, B65G65/00 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
B65G65/00 (EP);
B65G1/1373 (CN,US);
B07C3/08 (EP,US);
B07C3/003 (US);
B07C3/14 (US);
B07C5/36 (EP,US);
B65G1/0492 (CN);
B65G1/06 (EP,US);
B65G1/026 (EP);
B65G1/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/11] | B65G1/137, B65G1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] | Title | German: | SORTIERVORRICHTUNG | [2023/11] | English: | SORTING DEVICE | [2023/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRI | [2023/11] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2022 | Translation filed | 06.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2121204 (OPEX CORP [US]); | [IY]WO2016107562 (SHENZHEN SEAEVER INTELLIGENT TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN106219125 (NINGBO CHAOPING INTELLIGENT TECH CO LTD, et al); | [A]CN107954141 (LILING LVYUAN TRADING COMPANY); | [A]CN110386393 (HUIZHOU HC INFORMATION TECH CO LTD); | [Y]WO2019225234 (DAIFUKU KK [JP]); | [XP]CN212607339U (BEIJING JINGDONG QIANSHI TECH CO LTD) | International search | [A]JP2001072216 (TSUBAKIMOTO CHAIN CO); | [A]EP1205266 (CHRONOPOST SA [FR]); | [A]CN106516681 (YAN FUYING); | [Y]CN108438705 (HANGZHOU HUICANG INFORMATION TECH CO LTD); | [Y]CN209684570U (SHANGHAI ATOVO ROBOT CO LTD); | [A]CN209985803U (SHENZHEN SUNVATO ROBOT SYSTEM CO LTD); | [A]CN210304603U (SHANGHAI XINBA TECH EQUIPMENT CO LTD); | [PX]CN111792269 (BEIJING JINGDONG QIANSHI TECH CO LTD); | [PX]CN212607339U (BEIJING JINGDONG QIANSHI TECH CO LTD) |