EP4157136 - SYSTEM, APPARATUS, AND METHOD FOR REMOVING PATHOGENS FROM A DENTAL OPERATORY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hale, Robert G. 6000 Woodland View Drive Woodland Hills, CA 91367 / US | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 21814590.2 | 28.05.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021US34977 | Priority number, date | US202063031351P | 28.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063031351 P | US202063073662P | 02.09.2020 Original published format: US 202063073662 P | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021243279 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4157136 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61B90/40, A61G13/10 | [2024/30] | CPC: |
A61B90/05 (EP);
A61L9/145 (US);
A61G13/108 (EP);
A61B2090/401 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/14] | A61B90/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON PATHOGENEN AUS EINER ZAHNÄRZTLICHEN PRAXIS | [2023/14] | English: | SYSTEM, APPARATUS, AND METHOD FOR REMOVING PATHOGENS FROM A DENTAL OPERATORY | [2023/14] | French: | SYSTÈME, APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉLIMINATION D'AGENTS PATHOGÈNES D'UN CABINET DENTAIRE | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.08.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3537447 (GAUTHIER WILLIAM D, et al); | [A]GB1531514 (DUVLIS Z); | [A]JPS6018164 (SEKIMURA KK); | [Y]US2004005252 (SIESS HAROLD EDWARD [US]); | [XI]CN204428374U (LI WEICAI); | [XI]US2016018117 (SEKIGUCHI SHIGEO [JP], et al); | [XYI]US2017003015 (SCHREIBER KEVIN JOSEPH [US]); | [XI]US2018153637 (AL-SHAWI MODHER IBRAHIM [AU], et al); | [A]US2019117331 (SELF SEAN D [US], et al); | [XI]WO2019227828 (GUANGZHOU ANGEL BIOSAFETY TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) | International search | [A]US3881477 (VON OTTO ROBERT E); | [A]GB1475078 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK); | [Y]US2004005252 (SIESS HAROLD EDWARD [US]); | [A]US2008188170 (DELLA VALLE FRANCESCO [IT], et al); | [A]US2010280436 (SELF SEAN D [US], et al); | [X]US2016018117 (SEKIGUCHI SHIGEO [JP], et al); | [XY]US2017003015 (SCHREIBER KEVIN JOSEPH [US]); | [XY]US2018153637 (AL-SHAWI MODHER IBRAHIM [AU], et al); | [Y]US2019117331 (SELF SEAN D [US], et al) |