EP4238279 - ENFORCEMENT OF INTER-SEGMENT TRAFFIC POLICIES BY NETWORK FABRIC CONTROL PLANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | 05.01.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAIN, Prakash, C. Fremont, CA 94539 / US | 02 /
HOODA, Sanjay, Kumar Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | 03 /
KONDALAM, Satish, Kumar Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | 04 /
PENDHARKAR, Vikram, Vikas San Jose, CA 95128 / US | 05 /
VETTETH, Anoop Fremont, CA 94536 / US | 06 /
LUCAS, Solomon, T Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | [2023/36] | Representative(s) | Warren, Caroline Elisabeth, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2023/36] | Application number, filing date | 21815742.8 | 28.10.2021 | [2023/36] | WO2021US57074 | Priority number, date | US202017084453 | 29.10.2020 Original published format: US202017084453 | [2023/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022094097 | Date: | 05.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4238279 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/40, H04L41/0893 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
H04L63/0227 (EP,US);
H04L41/0894 (EP);
H04L63/0263 (EP);
H04L63/0272 (EP);
H04L2212/00 (US);
H04L47/825 (US);
H04L63/164 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] | Title | German: | DURCHSETZUNG VON INTERSEGMENTVERKEHRSRICHTLINIEN DURCH EINE NETZWERK-FABRIC-STEUERUNGSEBENE | [2023/36] | English: | ENFORCEMENT OF INTER-SEGMENT TRAFFIC POLICIES BY NETWORK FABRIC CONTROL PLANE | [2023/36] | French: | APPLICATION DE POLITIQUES DE TRAFIC INTER-SEGMENTS PAR UN PLAN DE COMMANDE DE STRUCTURE DE RÉSEAU | [2023/36] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | 12.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2004131059 (AYYAKAD RAM [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,10,11,13,14,19-22 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0082] * * claims 1-8 * [I] 3-5,7-9,12,15-18; | [A]US2018367337 (JAIN PRAKASH CHAND [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031] *; | [A]US2019132360 (SHIN SEUNGWON [KR], et al) [A] 3 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0084] ** figure 3 *; | [I]US2020036593 (SETHI DIVJYOT [US], et al) [I] 1-22 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0165] * * paragraph [0191] - paragraph [0198] * * figure 7 *; | [I]WO2020112345 (CISCO TECH INC [US]) [I] 1-22 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0089] * * claims 1,13 * |