EP4264984 - METHODS, SYSTEMS, AND COMPUTER READABLE MEDIA FOR MESSAGE VALIDATION IN FIFTH GENERATION (5G) COMMUNICATIONS NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | 16.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oracle International Corporation 500 Oracle Parkway Mailstop 5OP7 Redwood Shores, CA 94065 / US | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAJPUT, Jay Bangalore 560103 / IN | 02 /
MAHALANK, Shashikiran, Bhalachandra Bangalore 560076 / IN | 03 /
DAS, Koushik Bangalore 560100 / IN | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 21815743.6 | 28.10.2021 | [2023/43] | WO2021US57157 | Priority number, date | US202017123038 | 15.12.2020 Original published format: US202017123038 | [2023/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022132316 | Date: | 23.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4264984 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/06, H04W12/69 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
H04W12/0431 (US);
H04W12/0433 (US);
H04W12/69 (EP);
H04W48/16 (US);
H04W8/08 (US);
H04W84/042 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEME UND COMPUTERLESBARE MEDIEN ZUR NACHRICHTENVALIDIERUNG IN KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZEN DER FÜNFTEN GENERATION (5G) | [2023/43] | English: | METHODS, SYSTEMS, AND COMPUTER READABLE MEDIA FOR MESSAGE VALIDATION IN FIFTH GENERATION (5G) COMMUNICATIONS NETWORKS | [2023/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, SYSTÈMES ET SUPPORTS LISIBLES PAR ORDINATEUR POUR LA VALIDATION DE MESSAGES DANS DES RÉSEAUX DE COMMUNICATION DE CINQUIÈME GÉNÉRATION (5G) | [2023/43] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 31.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2019224157 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-20* page 12, line 3 - line 12 *; | [X]US2020344604 (HE CHENGDONG [CN], et al) [X] 1-20 * paragraph [0287] - paragraph [0295]; figure 8a * | by applicant | - 3GPP TS 29.510 | - 3GPP TS 23.003 | - 3GPP TS 29.573 | - 3GPP TS 33.501 | - 3GPP TS 29.509 |