EP4158010 - METHODS FOR STABLE GENOMIC INTEGRATION IN RECOMBINANT MICROORGANISMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BioPlx, Inc. 1800 30th Street, Suite 213 Boulder CO 80301 / US | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROUSE, Dan Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 02 /
STARZL, Timothy W. Boulder, CO 80303 / US | 03 /
STARZL, Ravi S. V. Boulder, CO 80303 / US | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Rimini, Rebecca, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia, 8 10152 Torino / IT | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 21818391.1 | 02.06.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021US35484 | Priority number, date | US202063033681P | 02.06.2020 Original published format: US 202063033681 P | US202063049544P | 08.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063049544 P | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021247729 | Date: | 09.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4158010 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/22, C12N15/63, C12N15/90 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
C12N15/70 (EP);
C12N15/111 (US);
C12N1/205 (US);
C12N15/10 (EP);
C12N15/74 (EP);
C12N15/90 (EP);
C12N9/6408 (US);
A61K35/74 (EP);
C12R2001/445 (US);
C12Y304/21026 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STABILEN GENOMISCHEN INTEGRATION IN REKOMBINANTE MIKROORGANISMEN | [2023/14] | English: | METHODS FOR STABLE GENOMIC INTEGRATION IN RECOMBINANT MICROORGANISMS | [2023/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'INTÉGRATION GÉNOMIQUE STABLE DANS DES MICROORGANISMES RECOMBINANTS | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 18.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2004096967 (GRYSEELS TIMOTHY D [US], et al) [Y] 60-61 * ; Especially: para [0237] *; | [Y]US2006260004 (FANG YIWEN [US], et al) [Y] 2-3, (4-5)/(2-3), 6, 41-54,57-61, 81-86 * ; para [0058] *; | [Y]US2007111294 (BURGARD ANTHONY P [US], et al) [Y] 58, 102, (104-106)/102 * ; Especially: para [0120] *; | [Y]US2007275378 (WERNER EKKEHARD [DE]) [Y] 96, (104-106)/96 * ; Especially: Abstract *; | [Y]US2008254008 (DROPULIC BORO [US], et al) [Y] 57-61 * ; Especially: Abstract, para [0119], [0123] *; | [Y]US2013177909 (OKUMURA TADAYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 48-51, 81-86 * ; Especially: Abstract; para [0008], Claim 18 *; | [Y]US2014248251 (ADELMAN DANIEL C [US]) [Y] 85 * para [0012] *; | [XY]US9371532 (COURT DONALD L [US], et al) [X] 1, (4-5)/1 * ; Abstract, col 7, In 14-19; col 7, In 30-36; col 10, In 13-18; col 23, In 64- col 24, In 3; claim 1 * [Y] 2-3, (4-5)/(2-3), 6, 41-54, 57-61, 81-86; | [XY]WO2017059245 (UNIV BOSTON [US]) [X] 95, 97-101, 103, (104-106)/(95, 97-101, 103) * ; Especially: Abstract, para [0005], [0021], [0040], [0068], [00171] * [Y] 96, 102, (104-106)/(96,102); | [Y] - Anonymous, "RecName: Full=Beta-galactosidase; Short=Beta-gal; AltName: Full=Lactase", Protein, (20210929), Database accession no. Q8VNN2, URL: Genbank, XP055880597 [Y] 84 * >. Entire document, Especially amino acids 1-1029 * | [Y] - Anonymous, "SubName: Full=Prolyl endopeptidase {ECO:0000313|EMBL:QGP72024.1};", UniProtKB, (20200422), Database accession no. A0A650ARX8, URL: Uniprot, XP055880993 [Y] 86 * >. Entire document, Especially Sequence amino acids 1-680 * |