EP4259369 - RECIPROCATING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | 16.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2023/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Angus Shanghai, 201108 / CN | 02 /
CAI, Mars Shanghai, 201620 / CN | 03 /
HAAS, Günter 86916 Kaufering / DE | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 21819056.9 | 18.11.2021 | [2023/42] | WO2021EP82057 | Priority number, date | CN202011456519 | 11.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011456519 | [2023/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022122330 | Date: | 16.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4259369 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B23D49/16, B23D51/02 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
B23D49/167 (EP);
B23D49/10 (CN);
B23D49/105 (US);
B23D49/16 (CN,US);
B23D51/00 (CN);
B23D51/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] | Title | German: | HIN- UND HERGEHENDES WERKZEUG | [2023/42] | English: | RECIPROCATING TOOL | [2023/42] | French: | OUTIL À MOUVEMENT ALTERNATIF | [2023/42] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/42] | 11.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US5421091 (GERRITSEN JR JOHN T [US]) [X] 1,9 * column 4, line 5 - line 33 * * figure 4 * [A] 3-6 [I] 2,7,8; | [XA]JP2002210612 (MAKITA CORP) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0020] * * figure - *[A] 2-8; | [XAI]CN105665820 (ZHEJIANG YAT ELECTRIC APPLIANCE CO LTD) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0042] * * figure - * [A] 4-6 [I] 2,3,7,8; | [XAI]CN205551638U (ZHEJIANG YAT ELECTRIC APPLIANCE CO LTD) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0042] * * figure - * [A] 4-6 [I] 2,3,7,8 |