EP4252409 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CAPTURING IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | 02.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Appario Global Solutions (AGS) AG Lindenstrasse 16 6340 Baar / CH | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VON BRAUN, Max 82362 Weilheim / DE | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstraße 4 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/40] | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21820590.4 | 29.11.2021 | [2023/40] | WO2021EP83432 | Priority number, date | EP20200210504 | 29.11.2020 Original published format: EP 20210504 | EP20210169258 | 19.04.2021 Original published format: EP 21169258 | [2023/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022112579 | Date: | 02.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4252409 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/222, H04N5/232, H04N5/272 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
H04N5/2224 (EP,US);
H04N23/60 (EP);
H04N23/635 (EP,US);
H04N5/272 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BILDERFASSUNG | [2023/40] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CAPTURING IMAGES | [2023/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE CAPTURE D'IMAGES | [2023/40] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | 25.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]JP2009224832 (EYEDENTIFY KK); | [Y]EP2309307 (TOBII TECHNOLOGY AB [SE]); | [Y]WO2018138366 (LANE GMBH [DE], et al) |