EP4149179 - TIME SYNCHRONIZATION METHOD, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, SERVER AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUO, Li Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
FU, Xiaoming Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/11] | Representative(s) | Osterhoff, Utz Bockermann Ksoll Griepenstroh Osterhoff Patentanwälte Bergstraße 159 44791 Bochum / DE | [2023/11] | Application number, filing date | 21821510.1 | 03.06.2021 | [2023/11] | WO2021CN98169 | Priority number, date | CN202010536254 | 12.06.2020 Original published format: CN202010536254 | [2023/11] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021249283 | Date: | 16.12.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4149179 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W56/00, G04R20/18 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
H04W56/0015 (EP);
H04W56/001 (CN,US);
G04R20/18 (EP);
H04J3/0638 (CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2023/11] | H04W56/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] | Title | German: | ZEITSYNCHRONISATIONSVERFAHREN, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG, SERVER UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2023/11] | English: | TIME SYNCHRONIZATION METHOD, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, SERVER AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2023/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SYNCHRONISATION TEMPORELLE, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, SERVEUR ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2023/11] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2022 | Translation filed | 07.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008165628 (URANO OSAMU [JP]); | [XI]CN103796296 (CHINA MOBILE COMM CORP); | [Y]CN104601268 (DATANG TELECOM CHENGDU INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [XYI]WO2016078310 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | International search | [XY]US2008165628 (URANO OSAMU [JP]); | [XY]CN101221410 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]); | [XY]CN101221413 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]); | [XY]CN101221412 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]); | [A]CN102281114 ; | [A]CN103796296 (CHINA MOBILE COMM CORP); | [Y]CN105682215 (ZTE CORP); |