EP4163125 - PNEUMATIC TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2023/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSAI Tomoyuki Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2023/15] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2023/15] | Application number, filing date | 21822699.1 | 27.05.2021 | [2023/15] | WO2021JP20248 | Priority number, date | JP20200099682 | 08.06.2020 Original published format: JP 2020099682 | [2023/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021251166 | Date: | 16.12.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4163125 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60C1/00, B60C3/00, C08K5/37, C08K5/372, C08L7/00, C08L9/00, B60C9/20, B60C9/22, B60C9/26, B60C3/04 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
B60C1/0016 (EP);
C08L9/06 (US);
B60C1/00 (US);
B60C1/0025 (EP);
B60C1/0041 (EP);
B60C3/04 (EP);
B60C9/2009 (EP);
B60C9/22 (EP);
B60C9/2204 (EP);
B60C9/26 (EP);
C08K5/37 (EP);
C08K5/38 (US);
C08K5/47 (US);
B60C2001/0066 (EP,US);
B60C2009/2035 (EP);
B60C2009/2083 (EP);
B60C2009/266 (EP);
B60C2200/04 (EP);
Y02T10/86 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L9/06, C08L91/06, C08K3/04, C08K5/09, C08K5/18, C08K3/22, C08K5/372 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/15] | B60C1/00, B60C3/00, C08K5/37, C08K5/372, C08L7/00, C08L9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] | Title | German: | LUFTREIFEN | [2023/15] | English: | PNEUMATIC TIRE | [2023/15] | French: | PNEUMATIQUE | [2023/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2022 | Translation filed | 02.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 15.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2102017 (PIRELLI [IT], et al) [I] 1-9 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] ** paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0052] *; | [I]US2016280886 (COSSU GIANCARLO [IT], et al) [I] 1-9 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0010] * * table 1; compound B *; | [I]CN109384965 (CHINA PETROLEUM & CHEM CORP, et al) [I] 1-9 * paragraph [0006] * * example 1 * | International search | [A]JPS63113045 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-9 * , entire text *; | [Y]JPH07195908 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [Y] 1, 2, 6, 8, 9 * , paragraphs [0001]-[0009], [0039], fig. 1 *; | [A]WO2008071208 (PIRELLI [IT], et al) [A] 1-9 * , entire text *; | [A]JP2009155631 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [A] 1-9 * , entire text *; | [A]WO2009107151 (PIRELLI [IT], et al) [A] 1-9 * , entire text *; | [A]JP2015124249 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * , entire text *; | [A]JP2016503392 (LANXESS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH) [A] 1-9 * , entire text *; | [A]CN105482200 (CHENGDU GUIBAO SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-9 * , entire text *; | [YA]JP2017502137 (BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION) [Y] 1, 2, 6, 8, 9 * , claims, paragraphs [0001]-[0047] * [A] 3-5, 7; | [Y]JP2017043202 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [Y] 1, 2, 6, 8, 9 * , paragraphs [0001]-[0010], [0040]-[0045], [0077]-[0086] *; | [A]JP2018062616 (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [A] 1-9 * , entire text *; | [A]CN109384965 (CHINA PETROLEUM & CHEM CORP, et al) [A] 1-9* , entire text *; | [A]JP2019094390 (JSR CORP) [A] 1-9 * , entire text * |