EP4168205 - FRICTION STIR WELDING TOOL ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Element Six (UK) Limited Global Innovation Centre Fermi Avenue Harwell Oxford Didcot, Oxfordshire OX11 0QR / GB | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GHOSH, Santonu Didcot, Oxfordshire OX11 0QR / GB | 02 /
DZEPINA, Branislav Didcot, Oxfordshire OX11 0QR / GB | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Brack, Paul, et al Element Six (UK) Limited Group Intellectual Property Global Innovation Centre Harwell Oxford Didcot Oxfordshire OX11 0QR / GB | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 21823803.8 | 29.11.2021 | [2023/17] | WO2021EP83358 | Priority number, date | GB20200019612 | 11.12.2020 Original published format: GB 202019612 | [2023/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022122447 | Date: | 16.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4168205 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B23K1/008, B23K20/12 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
B23K20/1255 (EP,GB,KR,US);
B23K20/125 (GB,KR);
B23K20/122 (GB);
B23K20/26 (US);
B23K2103/05 (GB,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Title | German: | REIBRÜHRSCHWEISSWERKZEUGANORDNUNG | [2023/17] | English: | FRICTION STIR WELDING TOOL ASSEMBLY | [2023/17] | French: | ENSEMBLE OUTIL DE SOUDAGE PAR FRICTION-MALAXAGE | [2023/17] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 20.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004155096 (ZIMMERMAN MICHAEL H [US], et al); | [Y]CN110497117 (CHANGCHUN INST TECH); | [Y]WO2020115192 (ELEMENT SIX UK LTD [GB]) |