EP4262837 - SUTHERLANDIA EXTRACT AND THE USE THEREOF IN THE MANUFACTURE OF A MEDICAMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acupharm International Proprietary Limited Plot 762 Botswana Road Gaborone / BW | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARAIS, Johannes Francois 2520 Potchefstroom / ZA | 02 /
VAN JAARSVELD, Jacobus Johannes 2520 Potchefstroom / ZA | 03 /
LAPORTA, James Clive Hurwitz 8001 Cape Town / ZA | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 21824696.5 | 15.12.2021 | [2023/43] | WO2021IB61739 | Priority number, date | NL20202027158 | 18.12.2020 Original published format: NL 2027158 | [2023/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022130222 | Date: | 23.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4262837 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/48, A61P35/00 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/48 (EP,US);
A61K2236/333 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Title | German: | EXTRAKT AUS SOURERLANDIA UND SEINE VERWENDUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ARZNEIMITTELS | [2023/43] | English: | SUTHERLANDIA EXTRACT AND THE USE THEREOF IN THE MANUFACTURE OF A MEDICAMENT | [2023/43] | French: | EXTRAIT DE SUTHERLANDIA ET SON UTILISATION DANS LA FABRICATION D'UN MÉDICAMENT | [2023/43] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 16.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/27] | 06.02.2024 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 27.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2024/27] | 27.02.2024 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I] - SHAKILA TOBWALA ET AL, "Antioxidant potential of Sutherlandia frutescens and its protective effects against oxidative stress in various cell cultures", BMC COMPLEMENTARY AND ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD., LONDON, GB, (20140729), vol. 14, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1472-6882-14-271, ISSN 1472-6882, page 271, XP021193104 [I] 1-31 * Discussion;; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1472-6882-14-271 | [I] - LEISCHING G. ET AL, "Sutherlandia frutescens treatment induces apoptosis and modulates the PI3-kinase pathway in colon cancer cells", SOUTH AFRICAN JOURNAL OF BOTANY - SUID-AFRIKAANS TYDSKRIFT VIRPLANTKUNDE, SA, (20150901), vol. 100, doi:10.1016/j.sajb.2015.04.013, ISSN 0254-6299, pages 20 - 26, XP055835913 [I] 1-31 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.sajb.2015.04.013 | [ID] - TAI JOSEPH ET AL, "In vitro culture studies of Sutherlandia frutescens on human tumor cell lines", JOURNAL OF ETHNOPHARMACOLOGY, IE, (20040701), vol. 93, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.jep.2004.02.028, ISSN 0378-8741, pages 9 - 19, XP055835901 [ID] 1-31 * abstract * * page 19, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jep.2004.02.028 | [A] - GONG XINGCHU ET AL, "Removing Tannins from Medicinal Plant Extracts Using an Alkaline Ethanol Precipitation Process: A Case Study of Danshen Injection", MOLECULES, (20141114), vol. 19, no. 11, doi:10.3390/molecules191118705, pages 18705 - 18720, XP055836497 [A] 1-31 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/molecules191118705 | by applicant | - TAI JCHEUNG SCHAN EHASMAN D, "In vitro culture studies of Sutherlandia frutescens on human tumor cell lines", J Ethnopharmacol., (20040700), vol. 93, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.jep.2004.02.028, pages 9 - 19, XP055835901 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jep.2004.02.028 |