EP4251298 - FILTER INTERLOCK WITH TABS MATING WITH A PEDESTAL OR A HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | 26.01.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Caterpillar Inc. 100 NE Adams Street Peoria, IL 61629-9510 / US | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OEDEWALDT, Stephen E. Mapleton, Illinois 61547 / US | 02 /
IMMEL, Jon T. Chillicothe, Illinois 61523 / US | 03 /
RIES, Jeffrey R. Metamora, Illinois 61548 / US | 04 /
MOREHOUSE III, Darrell L. Bedford, Texas 76021 / US | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 21824712.0 | 15.11.2021 | [2023/40] | WO2021US59335 | Priority number, date | US202017102831 | 24.11.2020 Original published format: US202017102831 | [2023/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022115258 | Date: | 02.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4251298 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01D29/21, B01D29/90, B01D35/30, B01D29/96 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
B01D29/21 (EP);
B01D35/306 (US);
B01D29/19 (US);
B01D29/90 (EP);
B01D29/96 (EP);
B01D35/30 (EP);
B01D2201/0415 (EP,US);
B01D2201/301 (EP);
B01D2201/316 (EP);
B01D2201/4015 (EP);
B01D2201/4038 (US);
B01D2201/4076 (EP);
B01D2201/4092 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Title | German: | FILTERVERRIEGELUNG MIT LASCHEN, DIE MIT EINEM SOCKEL ODER EINEM GEHÄUSE ZUSAMMENWIRKEN | [2023/40] | English: | FILTER INTERLOCK WITH TABS MATING WITH A PEDESTAL OR A HOUSING | [2023/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE DE FILTRE À LANGUETTES S'ACCOUPLANT AVEC UN SOCLE OU UN CARTER | [2023/40] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | 30.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2692686 (FLECK WILLIAM P, et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 16 - line 18; figure 2 * [A] 7-10; | [A]US2738879 (FRANTZ JOHN M) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]US2004050766 (JIANG ZEMIN [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5084170 |