EP4137243 - ALLOY PIPE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2023/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAKI, Shunsuke Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 02 /
YUGA, Masao Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 03 /
KATSUMURA, Tatsuro Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 04 /
KIJIMA, Hideo Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2023/08] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/08] | Application number, filing date | 21825664.2 | 12.05.2021 | [2023/08] | WO2021JP18107 | Priority number, date | JP20200105724 | 19.06.2020 Original published format: JP 2020105724 | [2023/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021256128 | Date: | 23.12.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4137243 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C21D7/10, C21D9/08, C21D6/00, C21D8/10, C21D1/26, C22C19/05, C22C38/00, C22C38/06, C22C38/42, C22C38/44, C22C38/46, C22C38/48, C22C38/50, C22C38/54, C22C38/58, C22C38/60, C22F1/10 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
C21D7/10 (EP);
C21D8/105 (EP,US);
C21D1/26 (EP);
C21D6/004 (EP,US);
C21D9/08 (EP);
C22C19/05 (EP);
C22C38/002 (EP);
C22C38/005 (EP);
C22C38/008 (EP);
C22C38/06 (EP);
C22C38/42 (EP);
C22C38/44 (EP);
C22C38/46 (EP);
C22C38/48 (EP);
C22C38/50 (EP);
C22C38/54 (EP);
C22C38/58 (EP);
C22C38/60 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/08] | B21D5/12, C21D9/08, C22C19/05, C22C38/00, C22C38/44, C22C38/60, C22F1/00, C22F1/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] | Title | German: | LEGIERUNGSROHR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2023/08] | English: | ALLOY PIPE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2023/08] | French: | TUYAU EN ALLIAGE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2023/08] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2022 | Translation filed | 18.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 18.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/08] | 11.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2690188 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,8,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0051] , [0 71] , [0 72] , [0 73] , [0 74] * [I] 5-7; | [A]EP3636789 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2020110597 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | EP3854890 [ ] (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [ ] * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH0790373 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-9 * , entire text *; | [A]WO2012128258 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * , entire text, all drawings *; | [A]WO2018225869 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * , entire text *; | [A]WO2020110597 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * , claims, drawings *; | [PA]JP2020158816 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [PA] 1-9* , entire text * | by applicant | JP5137048B |