EP4168877 - COMPUTER CASE WITH MODULAR I/O PANELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Simply Nuc, Inc. 495 Round Rock West Drive Round Rock, TX 78681 / US | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROWSELL, Aaron Round Rock, Texas 78681 / US | 02 /
WOELLNER, John Round Rock, Texas 78681 / US | 03 /
ABDOUCH, Charles B. Round Rock, Texas 78681 / US | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 21825730.1 | 18.06.2021 | [2023/17] | WO2021US38142 | Priority number, date | US202063041082P | 18.06.2020 Original published format: US 202063041082 P | [2023/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021258021 | Date: | 23.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4168877 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/18, G06F1/16, G06F1/20, H05K7/20, H05K7/14 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
G06F1/181 (EP);
H05K7/1488 (US);
G06F1/183 (EP);
G06F1/20 (EP);
H05K7/1439 (US);
H05K7/1452 (US);
H05K7/1487 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Title | German: | COMPUTERGEHÄUSE MIT MODULAREN E/A-PANEELEN | [2023/17] | English: | COMPUTER CASE WITH MODULAR I/O PANELS | [2023/17] | French: | BOÎTIER D'ORDINATEUR À PANNEAUX D'ENTRÉE/SORTIE MODULAIRES | [2023/17] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 07.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4652969 (STEGENGA JERRY A [US]); | [XI]US2011012484 (CHEN YUN-LUNG [TW], et al) | International search | [Y]US6114622 (DRAEGER RONALD MICHAEL [US]); | [XY]US6284970 (BUSKMILLER MICHAEL R [US], et al); | [A]US7483264 (CHEN YUN-LUNG [TW], et al); | [A]US10433468 (STURGIS SILVERSUN [US]); | [A]US10551884 (CHOU SHENG-CHIEN [TW], et al) |