EP4167561 - CAMERA CONTROL METHOD AND DEVICE, AND IN-SCREEN CAMERA STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAO, Li Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/16] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2023/16] | Application number, filing date | 21825850.7 | 18.05.2021 | [2023/16] | WO2021CN94304 | Priority number, date | CN202010549854 | 16.06.2020 Original published format: CN202010549854 | [2023/16] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021254069 | Date: | 23.12.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4167561 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/02, H04M1/22, H04N23/57, H04N23/74 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
H04M1/0264 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N23/74 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N23/56 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G03B15/03 (US);
H04M1/0266 (EP,CN,KR);
H04M1/22 (EP,CN,KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/16] | H04N5/225 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/16] | Title | German: | KAMERASTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE BILDSCHIRMINTERNE KAMERASTRUKTUR | [2023/16] | English: | CAMERA CONTROL METHOD AND DEVICE, AND IN-SCREEN CAMERA STRUCTURE | [2023/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE CAMÉRA, ET STRUCTURE DE CAMÉRA INTRA-ÉCRAN | [2023/16] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2022 | Translation filed | 28.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/16] | 29.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN110441958 (WUHAN CHINA STAR OPTOELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0042] * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]CN110491290 (WUHAN CHINA STAR OPTOELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0041] * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]CN111198458 (WUHAN CHINA STAR OPTOELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0057] ** figures 1-7 * | International search | [A]US2011310330 (UCHIDA TATSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-12* entire document *; | [A]CN110491290 (WUHAN CHINA STAR OPTOELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * entire document *; | [A]CN110658582 (WUHAN CHINA STAR OPTOELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * entire document *; | [A]CN111050045 (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * entire document *; | [A]CN111107193 (IMPRESSION COGNITION BEIJING TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * entire document * |