EP4171117 - COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, RELAY DEVICE, AND TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 28.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spreadtrum Communications (Shanghai) Co., Ltd. Spreadtrum Center, Building No. 1 Lane 2288, Zuchongzhi Road China (Shanghai) Pilot Free Trade Zone Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Xing Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 21825948.9 | 15.06.2021 | [2023/17] | WO2021CN100180 | Priority number, date | CN202010552800 | 17.06.2020 Original published format: CN202010552800 | [2023/17] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021254345 | Date: | 23.12.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4171117 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00, H04W88/04, H04W92/18 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
H04W36/033 (EP);
H04W36/0009 (EP,CN,US);
H04W36/0061 (US);
H04W36/03 (US);
H04W36/144 (EP,CN,US);
H04W76/11 (EP,CN);
|
Former IPC [2023/17] | H04W36/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG, RELAISVORRICHTUNG UND ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG | [2023/17] | English: | COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, RELAY DEVICE, AND TERMINAL DEVICE | [2023/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION, DISPOSITIF RELAIS ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL | [2023/17] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2023 | Translation filed | 02.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 28.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010061339 (KIM SUNG-KYUNG [KR], et al); | [Y]US2018077608 (JUNG SUNGHOON [KR], et al); | [Y]EP3429244 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD [CN]); | [A]US2020029391 (XU XIANG [CN], et al) |