EP4154631 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING SIDELINK RESOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Miao Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
SUN, Feifei Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
WU, Min Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2023/13] | Application number, filing date | 21826658.3 | 17.06.2021 | [2023/13] | WO2021KR07609 | Priority number, date | CN202010562442 | 17.06.2020 Original published format: CN202010562442 | CN202010779568 | 05.08.2020 Original published format: CN202010779568 | CN202110139715 | 01.02.2021 Original published format: CN202110139715 | CN202110363859 | 02.04.2021 Original published format: CN202110363859 | [2023/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021256872 | Date: | 23.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4154631 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/02, H04W72/04, H04W72/12, H04W92/18, H04W4/40, H04L5/00 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
H04L5/003 (EP);
H04W4/40 (EP,CN);
H04W74/0816 (US);
H04L5/0053 (CN);
H04W52/0261 (CN);
H04W72/02 (EP);
H04W72/20 (CN);
H04W74/0866 (US);
H04L5/0035 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/13] | H04W72/02, H04W72/04, H04W72/12, H04W92/18, H04W4/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON SIDELINK-RESSOURCEN | [2023/13] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING SIDELINK RESOURCE | [2023/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR DÉTERMINER UNE RESSOURCE DE LIAISON LATÉRALE | [2023/13] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 18.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2018030825 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al); | [Y]US2019075548 (LEE SEUNGMIN [KR], et al); | [XYI]US2019132818 (YASUKAWA SHIMPEI [JP], et al); | International search | [Y]KR20190039078 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 2-7,9-14 * paragraphs [0049], [0065], [0131] *; | [A]US2019313405 (LI YINGYANG [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0102]-[0221]; and figures 3-16 *; | [Y] - Samsung, "On Resource Allocation for NR V2X Mode 2", 3GPP Draft; R1-1910471, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20191008), vol. RAN WG1, no. Chongqing, China; 20191014 - 20191020, XP051789277 [Y] 2-7,9-14 | [A] - Nokia, Nokia Shanghai Bell, "Discussion of Resource Allocation for Sidelink - Mode 2", 3GPP Draft; R1-1910514-Nokia-5G_V2X_NRSL resource allocation mode 2, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20191008), vol. RAN WG1, no. Chongqing, China; 20191014 - 20191020, XP051789319 [A] 1-15 * sections 1-2 * | [A] - CAICT, "Considerations on the resource allocation for NR sidelink Mode2", 3GPP Draft; R1-1911323, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20191007), vol. RAN WG1, no. Chongqing, China; 20191014 - 20191020, XP051790089 [A] 1-15 * sections 1-2.4 * | by applicant | WO2018030825 | US2019075548 | US2019132818 |