EP4091990 - METHOD FOR PREPARING POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/47] | For all designated states Lg Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KWAK, Ick Soon Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
CHAE, Chang Wan Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
CHOI, Sang Soon Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
CHAE, Hwa Seok Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 21826917.3 | 14.06.2021 | [2022/47] | WO2021KR07370 | Priority number, date | KR20200072105 | 15.06.2020 Original published format: KR 20200072105 | [2022/47] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021256794 | Date: | 23.12.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4091990 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C01G53/00, H01M4/525, H01M4/505 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
C01G53/50 (EP,US);
C01G53/44 (KR);
H01M4/525 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/0471 (US);
H01M4/505 (KR,US);
C01P2002/52 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP);
C01P2004/84 (EP,US);
C01P2006/40 (US);
C01P2006/80 (EP);
H01M2004/028 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02T10/62 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POSITIVELEKTRODENAKTIVMATERIAL | [2022/47] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL | [2022/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE MATÉRIAU ACTIF D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE | [2022/47] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2022 | Translation filed | 18.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 18.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 01.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN105514409 (CN ELECT TECH NO 18 RES INST) [X] 1,3,5,8,9,11 * abstract * [I] 2,4,6,7,10,12; | [XI]CN109728262 (HIGH POINT SHENZHEN TECH CO LTD, et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,9-11 * example -; claim - * [I] 3,6-8,12; | [XAI]CN110422890 (DANGSHENG TECH CHANGZHOU NEW MATERIAL CO LTD) [X] 1,2,9 * example -; claim - * [A] 3[I] 4-8,10-12 | International search | [A]KR20140089851 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * See entire document. *; | [Y]KR20180015044 (ECOPRO BM CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-12 * See claim 15. *; | [Y]KR20190060705 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-12 * See claim 1; paragraph [0059]; and example 1. *; | [Y]KR20200036424 (POSCO [KR], et al) [Y] 12 * See claim 20; and example 1. *; | [A]KR20200065626 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-12* See entire document. * |