EP4171783 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTINUOUS GAS ADSORBATE CAPTURE USING ADSORPTION/REGENERATION CYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Socpra Sciences et Génie s.e.c. TransferTech Sherbrooke 200-35 rue Radisson Sherbrooke, Québec J1L 1E2 / CA | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROUILLETTE, Martin Sherbrooke, Québec J1J 4L4 / CA | 02 /
VEZINA, Gabriel Sherbrooke, Québec J1K 1S9 / CA | 03 /
CAMIRE, Alexandre Sherbrooke, Québec J1H 3T3 / CA | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/18] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 21828638.3 | 25.06.2021 | [2023/18] | WO2021CA50879 | Priority number, date | US202063044371P | 26.06.2020 Original published format: US 202063044371 P | [2023/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021258219 | Date: | 30.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4171783 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 30.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/02, B01D53/04, B01D53/08, B01D53/96 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
B01D53/62 (EP,US);
B01D53/08 (EP,US);
B01D53/0446 (EP);
B01D53/0462 (EP);
B01D53/82 (EP);
B01D53/83 (EP,US);
B01D53/96 (EP);
B01J20/3483 (US);
B01D2253/102 (EP);
B01D2253/108 (EP);
B01D2253/202 (EP);
B01D2253/204 (EP);
B01D2253/206 (EP);
B01D2253/34 (US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,US);
B01D2258/0283 (EP,US);
B01D2258/06 (EP,US);
B01D2259/4009 (EP,US);
Y02C20/40 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/18] | B01D53/02, B01D53/96 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN ERFASSUNG VON GASADSORBATEN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES ADSORPTIONS-/REGENERATIONSZYKLUS | [2023/18] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTINUOUS GAS ADSORBATE CAPTURE USING ADSORPTION/REGENERATION CYCLE | [2023/18] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CAPTURE D'ADSORBAT GAZEUX EN CONTINU À L'AIDE DE CYCLE D'ADSORPTION/DE RÉGÉNÉRATION | [2023/18] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 21.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009249954 (GADKAREE KISHOR PURUSHOTTAM [US], et al) [Y] 11* figures 1-aE *; | [XYI]US2015010452 (ELLIOTT JEANNINE ELIZABETH [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,8-10,13-15 * figures 10,12,13,15 * [Y] 11 [I] 3,4,7,11; | [XYI]WO2015103401 (EISENBERGER PETER AND CHICHILNISKY GRACIELA JOINTLY [US]) [X] 1,2,8-10,12,13,15 * figures 1-4,11,12 * [Y] 11 [I] 7; | [XYI]WO2020011156 (SHANGHAI SHENCHENG ENVIRONMENTAL PROT EQUIPMENT & ENGINEERING CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-6,8-10,12,14,15 * figures 3-12,18,19 * [Y] 11 [I] 7,11,13 | International search | [Y]JPH11169646 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 1-10, 12-13, 15-41, and 44-45 *Whole document*; | [Y]US7947118 (RARIG DAVID LESTER [US], et al) [Y] 15-22*Col.3, line 45-55*; | [XY]US2011296872 (EISENBERGER PETER [US]) [X] 46 *[0067], [0072], [0074], [0076], [0089], [0148], [0152], and [0231]-[0232]* [Y] 1-10, 12-13, 15-41, and 44-45; | [Y]US2015010452 (ELLIOTT JEANNINE ELIZABETH [US], et al) [Y] 8-9, 29-30, 40-41, and 44-45 *Abstract, and [00162]* |