EP4175342 - COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD AND COMMUNICATION CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 21.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2023/18] | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-Ku, Tokyo, 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURUICHI Sho Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 21829492.4 | 08.06.2021 | [2023/18] | WO2021JP21789 | Priority number, date | JP20200109971 | 25.06.2020 Original published format: JP 2020109971 | [2023/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021261243 | Date: | 30.12.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4175342 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/14, H04W52/28, H04W52/24, // H04W88/18, H04W52/36 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
H04W16/14 (EP);
H04W52/34 (US);
H04W52/243 (EP);
H04W52/283 (EP);
H04W52/367 (EP);
H04W88/18 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/18] | H04W16/14, H04W52/28, H04W52/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/18] | English: | COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD AND COMMUNICATION CONTROL DEVICE | [2023/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION | [2023/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2023 | Translation filed | 18.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 21.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2015207836 (NAT INST INF & COMM TECH) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0025] - [0036] - [0 54] - [0062] *; | [A]JP2019201236 (ADVANCED TELECOMMUNICATION RES INST INT) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0141] - [0165] * * figures 10-12 *; | [A] - FCC (JAY HOLCOMB (ITRON)), "FCC_R+O_FNPRM_promoting_unlicensed_use_of_the_6GHz_band_ET_18-295", vol. 802.18, (20200402), pages 1 - 124, IEEE DRAFT; 18-20-0062-00-0000-FCC-R-O-FNPRM-PROMOTING-UNLICENSED-USE-OF-THE-6GHZ-BAND-ET-18-295, IEEE-SA MENTOR, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, URL: https://mentor.ieee.org/802.18/dcn/20/18-20-0062-00-0000-fcc-r-o-fnprm-promoting-unlicensed-use-of-the-6ghz-band-et-18-295.pdf, (20200402), XP068172716 [A] 1-15 * page 23, lines 25-31 * * page 24, line 1 - page 25, line 3 * * page 25, lines 16-19 * * page 27, lines 7-25 * | [A] - Pradeep Reddy Vaka, "Security and Performance Issues in Spectrum Sharing between Disparate Wireless Networks", Thesis, Blacksburg, Virginia, (20170505), pages 1 - 72, URL: https://vtechworks.lib.vt.edu/bitstream/handle/10919/77960/Vaka_P_T_2017.pdf?sequence=1&isAllowed=y, (20190426), XP055583744 [A] 1-15 * Par. 2.3.1 - 2.3.3 * * figure 2.2 * | International search | [A]CN101345559 (ZEFU TAN [CN]) [A] 1-20* abstract *; | [A]JP2015207836 (NAT INST INF & COMM TECH) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0025]-[0036], [0054]-[0062] *; | [A]JP2019201236 (ADVANCED TELECOMMUNICATION RES INST INT) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0141]-[0165], fig. 10-12 * | by applicant | JP5258444B | JP6277893B | - CBRS Alliance ''CBRSA-TS-2001, (20180201), URL: https://www.cbrsalliance.org/wp-content/uploads/2018/06/CBRSA-TS-2001-V1.0.0.pdf | - "WINNF-TS-0112", WINNF (Wireless Innovation Forum | - "ECC Report 186 Technical and operational requirements for the operation of white space devices under geo-location approach", CEPT ECC, (20130100), URL: https://www.ecodocdb.dk/download/124023a2-73ee/ECCREP186.PDF | - "WINNF-SSC-0010", WINNF, URL: https://winnf.memberclicks.net/assets/CBRS/WINNF-SSC-0010.pdf | - "C.F.R (Code of Federal Regulations) Part 96", FCC (Federal Communications Commissions, URL: https://www.ecfr.gov/cgi-bin/retrieveECFR?gp=&SID=2dd346ae3b51f2866ab6fb907e755526&mc=true&r=PART&n=pt47.5.96 | - "TS (Technical Specification)36.104", 3GPP (3rd Generation Partnership Project, URL: https://portal.3gpp.org/desktopmodules/Specifications/SpecificationDetails.aspx?specificationId=2412 | - "TS38.104", 3GPP | - "EN 301 598", ETSI (European Telecommunications Standards Institute | - "WINNF-TS-0016", WINNF, URL: https://winnf.memberclicks.net/assets/CBRS/WINNF-TS-0016.pdf | - "WINNF-TS-0247", WINNF, URL: https://winnf.memberclicks.net/assets/CBRS/WINNF-TS-0247.pdf | - "WINNF-TS-0096", WINNF, URL: https://winnf.memberclicks.net/assets/CBRS/WINNF-TS-0096.pdf |