EP4144425 - BEHAVIOR CONTROL DEVICE, BEHAVIOR CONTROL METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1 Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOMEZ, Randy Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0188 / JP | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/10] | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21829758.8 | 22.06.2021 | [2023/10] | WO2021JP23545 | Priority number, date | JP20200108946 | 24.06.2020 Original published format: JP 2020108946 | JP20200122009 | 16.07.2020 Original published format: JP 2020122009 | JP20200132962 | 05.08.2020 Original published format: JP 2020132962 | [2023/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021261474 | Date: | 30.12.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4144425 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/006, G06N3/0464, G06N3/048, G06N3/09, G06N3/092, G06N7/01, G06N20/00, B25J11/00, G06F3/01, G06F3/03, G10L15/00 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
B25J11/0015 (EP);
B25J11/001 (US);
G05B13/027 (US);
G06F3/017 (EP);
G06F3/0304 (EP);
G06N20/00 (EP);
G06N3/006 (EP);
G06N3/0464 (EP);
G06N3/09 (EP,US);
G06N3/092 (EP,US);
G06V40/174 (US);
G06V40/20 (US);
G10L25/51 (US);
G06N3/048 (EP);
G06N7/01 (EP);
G10L15/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/42] | A63H11/00, B25J9/22, B25J13/00, B25J13/08, G06N20/00, G10L15/22, G06F3/01, G06N3/0464, G06N3/09, G06N3/048, G06N3/092 | ||
Former IPC [2023/10] | A63H11/00, B25J9/22, B25J13/00, B25J13/08, G06N20/00, G10L15/22, G06F3/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | VERHALTENSSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VERHALTENSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2023/10] | English: | BEHAVIOR CONTROL DEVICE, BEHAVIOR CONTROL METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2023/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE COMPORTEMENT, ET PROGRAMME | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2022 | Translation filed | 02.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2017173141 (JIBO INC [US]) [X] 1-7,14,15,19,20 * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0342] * * figures 1-13 * [I] 8-13,16-18; | [I] - ISAACS PAUL M ET AL, "Controlling dynamic simulation with kinematic constraints", COMPUTER GRAPHICS, ACM, US, (19870801), vol. 21, no. 4, doi:10.1145/37402.37428, ISSN 0097-8930, pages 215 - 224, XP059139582 [I] 8-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/37402.37428 | International search | [A]JP2007125645 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-20 * , entire text, all drawings *; | [YA]JP2013225192 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [Y] 14-15, 17, 19-20 * , particularly, paragraphs [0043], [0049] * [A] 1-13, 16, 18; | [XA]JP2018030185 (FANUC LTD) [X] 14-15, 19-20 * , particularly, paragraphs [0021]-[0074] * [A] 1-13, 16-18; | [XA]US2018117762 (EARWOOD COREY [US], et al) [X] 8, 11-13 * , particularly, paragraphs [0021]-[0114], fig. 1-6 * [A] 1-7, 9-10, 14-20; | [XYA]US2020009739 (MOON YOONJI [KR]) [X] 1-7 * , particularly, paragraphs [0032]-[0309], fig. 1-16 * [Y] 14-15, 17, 19- 20 [A] 8-13, 16, 18; | [A]JP2020089947 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-20* , entire text, all drawings * | by applicant | JP2020108946 | JP2020122009 | JP2020132962 | - E. POTJ. MONCEAUXR. GELINB. MAISONNIER, "Choregraphe: a graphical tool for humanoid robot programming", RO-MAN 2009- The 18th IEEE International Symposium on Robot and Human Interactive Communication, (20090900), pages 46 - 51, XP031563577 |