EP4228426 - METHODS OF INTERNMENT CALORIC RESTRICTION FOR IMPARTING HEALTH BENEFITS TO AN ANIMAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | 09.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2023/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAN, Yuanlong Chesterfield, Missouri 63017 / US | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [2023/34] | Application number, filing date | 21830754.4 | 17.11.2021 | [2023/34] | WO2021IB60669 | Priority number, date | US202063120777P | 03.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063120777 P | [2023/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022118130 | Date: | 09.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4228426 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A23K50/00, A23L33/00, A23L33/20 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
A23K50/40 (EP,US);
A23K20/163 (US);
A23K20/158 (EP);
A23L33/20 (EP);
A23V2200/30 (EP);
A23V2200/302 (EP);
A23V2200/332 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR INTERNALISIERUNG EINER KALORISCHEN EINSCHRÄNKUNG ZUR GESUNDHEITSVERBESSERUNG FÜR EIN TIER | [2023/34] | English: | METHODS OF INTERNMENT CALORIC RESTRICTION FOR IMPARTING HEALTH BENEFITS TO AN ANIMAL | [2023/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE RESTRICTION CALORIQUE INTERMITTENTE POUR CONFÉRER DES BIENFAITS POUR LA SANTÉ À UN ANIMAL | [2023/34] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/34] | 17.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2014056851 (PAN YUANLONG [US]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-20 *; | [X]US2019075834 (PAN YUANLONG [US]) [X] 1-15 * example 1 (see, in particular, paragraphs 55 and 56) *; | [T] - MATTSON M P ET AL, "Beneficial effects of intermittent fasting and caloric restriction on the cardiovascular and cerebrovascular systems", THE JOURNAL OF NUTRITIONAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 16, no. 3, ISSN 0955-2863, (20050301), pages 129 - 137, (20050301), XP027618766 [T] 1-15 * page 129 * | by applicant | - GOODRICK et al., Mech Ageing Dev, (19900000), vol. 55, pages 69 - 87 | - SOGAWA HKUBO C, Mech Ageing Dev, (20000000), vol. 115, pages 61 - 71 | - WEI et al., Sci Transl. Med, (20170000), vol. 9, page waai8700 |