EP4264945 - ADAPTING LUMA MAPPING WITH CHROMA SCALING TO 4:4:4 RGB IMAGE CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | 23.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital CE Patent Holdings, SAS 3 rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANCOIS, Edouard 35576 CESSON-SEVIGNE / FR | 02 /
HIRON, Franck 35576 CESSON-SEVIGNE / FR | 03 /
CHEVANCE, Christophe 35576 CESSON-SEVIGNE / FR | 04 /
JULLIAN, Remi 35576 CESSON-SEVIGNE / FR | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Interdigital Immeuble ZEN 2 845 A, avenue des Champs Blancs 35510 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 21830974.8 | 03.12.2021 | [2023/43] | WO2021EP84273 | Priority number, date | EP20200306616 | 18.12.2020 Original published format: EP 20306616 | [2023/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022128549 | Date: | 23.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4264945 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/186, H04N19/12, H04N19/122, H04N19/70 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
H04N19/70 (EP,US);
H04N19/186 (EP,US);
H04N19/12 (EP,US);
H04N19/122 (EP);
H04N19/136 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Title | German: | ANPASSUNG VON LUMA-KARTIERUNG MIT CHROMASKALIERUNG AUF 4:4:4 RGB-BILDINHALT | [2023/43] | English: | ADAPTING LUMA MAPPING WITH CHROMA SCALING TO 4:4:4 RGB IMAGE CONTENT | [2023/43] | French: | ADAPTATION DE MAPPAGE DE LUMINANCE AVEC MISE À L'ÉCHELLE DE CHROMINANCE AU CONTENU D'IMAGE RVB 4:4:4 | [2023/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 12.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |