EP4176717 - COCCIDIOSIS CONTROL AGENT AND METHOD FOR USING COCCIDIOSIS CONTROL AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nihon Nohyaku Co., Ltd. 19-8, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8386 / JP | [2023/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJIHARA, Hirokazu Kawachinagano-shi, Osaka 586-0094 / JP | 02 /
FUCHI, Shunsuke Kawachinagano-shi, Osaka 586-0094 / JP | 03 /
ABE, Yutaka Kawachinagano-shi, Osaka 586-0094 / JP | [2023/19] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/19] | Application number, filing date | 21831706.3 | 02.07.2021 | [2023/19] | WO2021JP25130 | Priority number, date | JP20200115725 | 03.07.2020 Original published format: JP 2020115725 | JP20200151716 | 10.09.2020 Original published format: JP 2020151716 | [2023/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022004877 | Date: | 06.01.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4176717 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A01M1/20, A61P33/02, C07D401/04, C07D491/113, A01P7/04, A01N43/52, A01N47/02, A61K31/4439, A61K31/444, A61K31/695 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
A61P33/02 (EP,US);
A61K31/4439 (EP,US);
A01N43/52 (EP);
A01N47/02 (EP);
A61K31/444 (EP);
C07D401/04 (EP);
C07D491/113 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] | Title | German: | COCCIDIOSE-BEKÄMPFUNGSMITTEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DES COCCIDIOSE-BEKÄMPFUNGSMITTELS | [2023/19] | English: | COCCIDIOSIS CONTROL AGENT AND METHOD FOR USING COCCIDIOSIS CONTROL AGENT | [2023/19] | French: | AGENT DE LUTTE CONTRE LA COCCIDIOSE ET MÉTHODE D'UTILISATION D'UN AGENT DE LUTTE CONTRE LA COCCIDIOSE | [2023/19] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2023 | Translation filed | 25.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005028447 (S BIO PTE LTD [SG], et al); | [X]WO2008140239 (KOREA RES INST CHEM TECH [KR], et al); | [X]WO2009051705 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al); | [X]US2009105266 (GLATTHAR RALF [DE], et al); | [X]US2017210741 (AUGELLI-SZAFRAN CORINNE E [US], et al); | [X]WO2019049061 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE IP DEV LTD [GB]); | [XDAI]CA3100183 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD [JP]); | [E]EP4349824 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD [JP]); | International search | [A]US2012101096 (HEDSTROM LIZBETH K [US], et al); | [XA]WO2019225663 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | JP2004051510 | WO2019225663 |