EP4178079 - WIRELESS POWER TRANSMITTING APPARATUS AND CHARGING STATE DISPLAY METHOD FOR ELECTRONIC DEVICE USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Eunha Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
CHUNG, Eunvit Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Jaeseok Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
SONG, Jeonghan Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 05 /
YEO, Sungku Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/19] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2023/19] | Application number, filing date | 21831836.8 | 02.07.2021 | [2023/19] | WO2021KR08465 | Priority number, date | KR20200081419 | 02.07.2020 Original published format: KR 20200081419 | [2023/19] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022005262 | Date: | 06.01.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4178079 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02J50/90, H02J7/00, G01R31/382, H01F38/14, G01S7/41, H02J50/40, H02J50/00, H02J50/12, G01S13/02, G01S13/06, H02J7/02, H02J50/80 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
H01F38/14 (EP,KR);
H02J50/90 (EP,KR,US);
H02J50/12 (EP,KR,US);
G01R31/382 (EP,KR);
G01S13/0209 (EP,KR);
G01S7/415 (KR);
H02J50/005 (EP,KR,US);
H02J50/40 (EP,KR,US);
H02J50/402 (EP);
H02J50/80 (EP,US);
H02J7/0047 (US);
H02J7/0048 (KR);
H02J7/005 (KR);
H02J7/02 (EP);
G01S13/06 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/19] | H02J50/90, H02J7/00, G01R31/382, H01F38/14, G01S7/41, H02J50/40, H02J50/00, H02J50/12, G01S13/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR DRAHTLOSEN STROMÜBERTRAGUNG UND LADEZUSTANDSANZEIGEVERFAHREN FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2023/19] | English: | WIRELESS POWER TRANSMITTING APPARATUS AND CHARGING STATE DISPLAY METHOD FOR ELECTRONIC DEVICE USING SAME | [2023/19] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION DE PUISSANCE SANS FIL ET PROCÉDÉ D'AFFICHAGE D'ÉTAT DE CHARGE POUR DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE L'UTILISANT | [2023/19] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2023 | Translation filed | 31.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/19] | 17.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015171931 (WON YUNJAE [KR], et al) [A] 14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0064] , [0075] * * figures 4,5 *; | [X]WO2016099032 (HANRIM POSTECH CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2016365190 (JEONG IN WHA [KR], et al) [A] 5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0048] - [0056] * * figures 2,4,5a * * claim 12 *; | [XI]US2017133881 (CHO YU-MIN [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8,10,11,15 * abstract * * figures 1,2,3,4 * * paragraphs [0008] , [0045] , [0054] , [0052] , [0057] , [0060] , [0062] , [0090] , [0091] , [0115] - [0119] * * figures 5A-5B, 6A-6F * * paragraphs [0121] , [0123] , [0128] , [0140] , [0141] , [0151] , [0157] , [0159] * * paragraph [0163] * [I] 5,7,9,12-14; | US2017165843 [ ] (LEE SO HEE [KR], et al) [ ] * the whole document *; | [Y]KR20170071210 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0093] - [0104] * * figure 7 *; | [A]WO2018226259 (APPLE INC [US]) [A] 15 * paragraphs [0214] , [0215] *; | [Y]KR20190058421 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0035] - [0060] * * claims 1-10 *; | [A]KR20190079364 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0076] - [0087]; figures 9-12 *; | [A]US2019305597 (VENKATRAMAN KARTIK R [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0045]; figure 3 *; | [Y]KR20190142782 (APPLE INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0047] , [0220] - [0299] * * figures 6aa-1d *; | [AP]EP3712016 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [AP] 1-15* abstract *; | US2022337099 [ ] (JUNG CHUN KIL [KR], et al) [ ] * abstract * * figures 1,12 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0051] , [0072] , [0073] , [0123] , [0157] , [0158] , [0166] , [0203] , [0206] , [0231] , [0239] , [0235] * * claims 29,39 * | International search | [Y]KR20170071210 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 5 * See paragraphs [0093]-[0104], and figure 7. *; | [Y]KR20190058421 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0035]-[0060], claims 1-10, and figure 2. *; | [A]KR20190079364 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0076]-[0087], and figures 9-12. *; | [A]US2019305597 (VENKATRAMAN KARTIK R [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraph [0045], and figure 3. *; | [Y]KR20190142782 (APPLE INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0047] and [0220]-[0299], and figures 6aa-11d. * |